Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Joan A Lenard
Referred: Patrick A White
Case #: 1:15-cv-20290
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jan 26, 2015
Terminated:Jan 06, 2017

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, January 09, 2017
36 36 order Order Withdrawing Reference/Case No Longer Referred Mon 01/09 11:31 AM
Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 1/9/2017. (br)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 06, 2017
35 35 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 01/06 1:52 PM
ORDER ADOPTING33 Report of Magistrate Judge, GRANTING32 Defendant Dr. Francisco Perez-Clavijo's Motion to Dismiss for Repeated Failure to Comply with Court Order, and DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of prosecution. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 1/6/2017. (gie)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 12, 2016
34 34 notice Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail Mon 12/12 2:55 PM
Clerk's Second Notice of Undeliverable Mail re33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re32 MOTION to Dismiss31 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Sanctions, filed by Francisco Perez Clavijo Recommending 1. Defendant Perez-Clavijos motion to dismiss for failure to comply with. US Mail returned for: Nathan Brewer . The Court has not located an updated address for this party. Court notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (drz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 29, 2016
33 33 motion Report and Recommendations Tue 11/29 1:52 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re32 MOTION to Dismiss31 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Sanctions, filed by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Recommending 1. Defendant Perez-Clavijos motion to dismiss for failure to comply with this courts orders regarding discovery be granted (DE# 32). 2. The case be closed. Objections to R&R due by 12/16/2016 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 11/29/2016. (tw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 01, 2016
32 32 motion Dismiss Tue 11/01 4:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss31 Order on Motion to Compel,, Order on Motion for Sanctions, by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Responses due by 11/18/2016(Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 11, 2016
31 31 order Order on Motion to Compel Order on Motion for Sanctions Tue 10/11 10:13 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion to Compel and the Plaintiff is required to comply with the pending discovery requests on or before October 17, 2016; denying28 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 10/4/2016. (br)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2016
30 30 notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 10/04 9:52 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re28 Second MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FRCP 37(b)(2)(A) . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (asl)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 03, 2016
29 29 misc Initial Disclosure(s) Mon 10/03 4:00 PM
Initial Disclosure(s) of RULE 26 DISCLOSURES by Francisco Perez Clavijo (Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Compel Mon 10/03 3:36 PM
Second MOTION to Compel DISCOVERY RESPONSES AND MOTION FOR SANCTIONS PURSUANT TO FRCP 37(b)(2)(A) by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Responses due by 10/20/2016(Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Thursday, September 22, 2016
27 27 notice Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail Thu 09/22 11:55 AM
Clerk's First Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 26 Order on Motion to Compel, 25 Order on Motion for Clarification,. US Mail returned for: Nathan Brewer . The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two unsuccessful noticing attempts, notices from the Court will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (drz)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2016
26 26 order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 09/09 2:49 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting24 Motion to Compel plaintiff to respond to the Defendant's Interrogatories on or before September 23, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/9/2016. (erd)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order on Motion for Clarification Fri 09/09 2:14 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting22 Motion for Clarification to the extent that this court confirms that the plaintiff has been released and future discovery requests should be mailed to 1049 Brentwood Drive, Apartment 19, Daytona Beach, FL 32117. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 9/9/2016. (erd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2016
24 24 motion Compel Thu 09/08 3:38 PM
Amended MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production served on July 7, 2016 by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Responses due by 9/26/2016(Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Defendant's Motion to Compel
Tuesday, September 06, 2016
23 23 motion Compel Tue 09/06 3:47 PM
MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Interrogatories and Request for Production served on July 7, 2016 by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Responses due by 9/23/2016 (Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 24, 2016
22 22 motion Clarification Wed 08/24 3:27 PM
MOTION for clarification18 Scheduling Order by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 22, 2016
21 21 discov Notice of Filing Discovery Fri 07/22 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Filing Discovery: Certificate of Non-Objection by Francisco Perez Clavijo.(Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2016
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/05 3:22 PM
NOTICE by Francisco Perez Clavijo (Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 10, 2016
19 19 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 06/10 5:25 PM
ORDER ADOPTING16 Report of the Magistrate Judge and DENYING15 Defendant Perez-Clavijo's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 6/10/2016. (gie)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/10 2:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/17/2016. Discovery due by 10/3/2016. Joinder of Parties due by 10/17/2016. Motions due by 11/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 6/10/2016. (tw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2016
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/02 1:33 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Francisco Perez Clavijo. (Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 19, 2016
16 16 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 05/19 10:02 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re15 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint filed by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Recommending that Perez-Clavijo's motion to dismiss (DE#15) be DENIED and that Perez-Clavijo be ordered to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint (DE#1) by a date certain. Objections to R&R due by 6/6/2016 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 5/19/2016. (tw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 18, 2015
15 15 motion Dismiss Fri 12/18 1:51 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint by Francisco Perez Clavijo. Attorney Rafael E. Martinez added to party Francisco Perez Clavijo(pty:dft). Responses due by 1/7/2016 (Martinez, Rafael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 17, 2015
14 14 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 12/17 9:34 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline Mohammad Masri served on 12/14/2015, answer due 1/4/2016. (asl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 01, 2015
13 13 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 12/02 3:39 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by Nathan Brewer. Francisco Perez Clavijo served on 11/24/2015, answer due 12/15/2015. (jas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 26, 2015
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 08/26 11:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Dr. Francisco Perez Clavijo, Dr. Mohammad Masri. (pes)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 24, 2015
11 11 order Order Mon 08/24 3:44 PM
ORDER RE SERVICE OF PROCESS REQUIRING PERSONAL SERVICE UPON AN INDIVIDUAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 8/24/2015. (tw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2015
10 10 order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 06/26 1:10 PM
ORDER ADOPTING9 Preliminary Report of Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 6/26/2015. (gie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 26, 2015
9 9 motion Report and Recommendations Thu 02/26 2:09 PM
PRELIMINARY REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re1 Complaint filed by Nathan Brewer. Recommending The claim(s) against Defendant Larkin Community Hospital be dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Objections to R&R due by 3/16/2015 Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 2/26/2015. (tw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 23, 2015
8 8 notice Notice of Change of Address Mon 02/23 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Nathan Brewer. (Address updated and Civil Cover Sheet sent). (ar2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
7 7 order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Wed 02/11 9:00 AM
INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 2/10/2015. (tw)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/11 8:58 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White on 2/10/2015. (tw)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 26, 2015
5 5 notice Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Tue 01/27 9:37 AM
Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Civil Cover Sheet not filed pursuant to Local Rule 3.3. (lrz) Modified on 1/27/2015 (lrz)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 01/27 9:35 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Brewer. (lrz) Modified on 1/27/2015 (lrz)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment Tue 01/27 9:29 AM
Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (lrz) Modified on 1/27/2015 (lrz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment - FORM Tue 01/27 9:27 AM
Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Consent Form attached. (lrz) Modified on 1/27/2015 (lrz)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/27 9:22 AM
COMPLAINT against Francisco Perez Clavijo, Larkin Community Hospital, Mohammad Masi. IFP Filed, filed by Nathan Brewer.(lrz) Modified on 1/27/2015 (lrz)
Related: [-]