California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 4:15-cv-00382
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Jul 26, 2015 5:12 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Joseph Lonsdale
Represented By
Brenda R. Sharton
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Kristen Garcia Dumont
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Joseph Friedman Tartakovsky
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Farris
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Aldridge
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Sarah M Vacchiano
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Elise Clougherty
Represented By
Jonathan David Grunberg
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
L. Lin Wood
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
John C Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook
contact info
Jennifer Lin Liu
The Liu Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
David Mead Ehrlich
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Lonsdale
Represented By
Brenda R. Sharton
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Laura Kathryn O'Boyle
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Kristen Garcia Dumont
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Joseph Friedman Tartakovsky
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Farris
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Aldridge
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Sarah M Vacchiano
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elise Clougherty
Represented By
Jonathan David Grunberg
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
L. Lin Wood
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
John C Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook
contact info
Jennifer Lin Liu
The Liu Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
David Mead Ehrlich
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Formation8 GP, LLC
Terminated: 03/05/2015
Represented By
John Watkins Keker
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Rebekah Leigh Punak
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Formation8 Partners, LLC
Terminated: 03/05/2015
Represented By
John Watkins Keker
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Rebekah Leigh Punak
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info

Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
26 26 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Wed 02/11 4:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/11 3:53 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Elise Clougherty.. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Wed 02/11 9:44 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Joseph Lonsdale.. (Dumont, Kristen) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 02/11 9:01 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Elise Clougherty. Service waived by Formation8 GP, LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2015, answer due 4/13/2015; Formation8 Partners, LLC waiver sent on 2/10/2015, answer due 4/13/2015. (Clune, John) (Filed on 2/11/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
22 22 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 02/10 11:48 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge within 14 days of this notice. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this entry) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 06, 2015
21 21 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/06 3:48 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 20 John C. Clune's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 05, 2015
20 20 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/05 7:56 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9264257.) filed by Elise Clougherty.(Clune, John) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, February 02, 2015
19 19 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/03 11:27 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 16 Orin Snyder's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/03 11:26 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 13 L. Lin Wood's Motion for admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2015)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 30, 2015
17 17 cmp Counterclaim Fri 01/30 5:27 PM
COUNTERCLAIM against Elise Clougherty. Filed byJoseph Lonsdale.(Dumont, Kristen) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-18
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/30 5:05 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9252475.) filed by Joseph Lonsdale.(Snyder, Orin) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/30 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Richard Farris for Joseph Lonsdale (Farris, Joseph) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/30 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Garcia Dumont for Joseph Lonsdale (Dumont, Kristen) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/30 2:20 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9251218.) filed by Elise Clougherty.(Wood, L. Lin) (Filed on 1/30/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing
Thursday, January 29, 2015
12 12 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/29 12:01 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 10 David Mead Ehrlich's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/29 9:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan David Grunberg for Elise Clougherty (Grunberg, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 01/29 8:25 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9245666.) filed by Elise Clougherty.(Ehrlich, David) (Filed on 1/29/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing
Wednesday, January 28, 2015
9 9 order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/28 4:32 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 8 Jonathan David Grunberg's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/28 3:12 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-9244559.) filed by Elise Clougherty.(Grunberg, Jonathan) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Letter of Good Standing
7 7 service Summons Issued Wed 01/28 11:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Formation8 GP, LLC, Formation8 Partners, LLC, Joseph Lonsdale. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 01/28 8:46 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/29/2015. Case Management Conference set for 5/6/2015 01:30 PM. (vlkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2015)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 27, 2015
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Tue 01/27 1:40 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/27 1:30 PM
Proposed Summons. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/27 1:30 PM
Proposed Summons. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons Tue 01/27 1:29 PM
Proposed Summons. (Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 01/27 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT $400 fee paid 0971-9240146 against Formation8 GP, LLC, Formation8 Partners, LLC, Joseph Lonsdale. Filed byElise Marie Clougherty.(Liu, Jennifer) (Filed on 1/27/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet