Pentecostal Church of God of America, Florida Dist
Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | K Rodney May |
Case #: | 8:15-bk-00924 |
Case Filed: | Jan 30, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Mar 04, 2015 |
Claims Deadline: | May 18, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 09, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Pentecostal Church of God of America, Florida District, Inc.
10320 Main St
Thonotosassa, FL 33592-8326 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago |
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Fri 01/05 1:03 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Pamella) |