Reed v. South Bend Nights, Inc.
Michigan Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nancy G Edmunds |
Referred: | Stephanie Dawkins Davis |
Case #: | 2:15-cv-10443 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1981 Sex Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Feb 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2016 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 02, 2015 7:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
South Bend Nights, Inc.
24725 GREENFIELD RD
SOUTHFIELD, MI 48075 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Reed
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 22 2015
OPINION & ORDER denying 10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet) |
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
order
Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order
Thu 03/24 3:24 PM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) w/out costs or fees. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet) |
|
Wednesday, March 09, 2016 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 03/10 10:02 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis: Settlement Conference held on 3/9/2016 Disposition: Settlement reached. Confidential terms of settlement placed on the record under seal. (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (THal) |
||
Tuesday, January 26, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/26 3:46 PM
ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. ( Settlement Conference set for 3/9/2016 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis **IN FLINT**. Confidential Settlement Statements due by 2/24/2016. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis. (THal) |
|
Tuesday, January 19, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Appearance
Tue 01/19 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel A. Gwinn on behalf of South Bend Nights, Inc.. (Gwinn, Daniel) |
|
Thursday, January 14, 2016 | ||
16 | 16
order
Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge*
Thu 01/14 10:36 AM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Davis : Settlement Conference. Counsel shall contact the Court immediately after s/conf to report results of s/conf and if case does not resolve, new dates will be reset. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet) |
|
order
Text-Only Reassignment Pursuant to Administrative Order
Thu 01/14 10:24 AM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from Magistrate Judge Michael J. Hluchaniuk to Magistrate Judge Stephanie Dawkins Davis pursuant to Administrative Order. (SSch) |
||
notice
Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled
Thu 01/14 10:34 AM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Final Pretrial on 1/21/16 and 2/2/16 Trial are Cancelled (CBet) |
||
Wednesday, January 06, 2016 | ||
15 | 15
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys
Wed 01/06 2:25 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER w/drawing co-counsel Larissa Ann Overley Zubac as counsel for deft. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet) |
|
Tuesday, December 22, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 12/22 8:38 AM
OPINION & ORDER denying10 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet) |
|
Wednesday, December 16, 2015 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 12/16 3:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds: Motion Hearing held on 12/16/2015 re10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by South Bend Nights, Inc. Disposition: taken under advisement(Court Reporter Suzanne Jacques) (CBet) |
||
Friday, October 30, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 10/30 1:14 PM
RESPONSE to10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by All Plaintiffs. (Roumel, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Deposition of Tracy Reed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Deposition of Chelsea Sparks, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1 - Ashley Hargrow Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2 - Time Cards, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3 - Oct 2 Termination Document, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4 - Oct 3 Termination Document, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5 - EEOC v. Harris | ||
Thursday, October 22, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/22 12:42 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time for pltf to file response to motion for summary judgment by 10/30/15; reply due 11/20/15. Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (CBet) |
|
Tuesday, October 06, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Hearing on Motion*
Tue 10/06 9:52 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING on10 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2015 02:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (CBet) |
|
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 09/30 4:05 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by South Bend Nights, Inc.. (Zubac, Larissa) |
|
Att: 1 Document Continuation brief in support of motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit exhibit 1 EEOC, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit exhibit 2 Jirjis Affidavit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit exhibit 3 Sparks Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit exhibit 4 Judeh Affidavit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit exhibit 5 Sparks Deposition, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit exhibit 6 Reed Deposition | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Wed 09/30 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Larissa Ann Overley Zubac on behalf of South Bend Nights, Inc.. (Zubac, Larissa) |
|
Wednesday, July 01, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
trial
Witness List
Wed 07/01 6:20 PM
PRELIMINARY WITNESS LIST by Tracy Reed (Roumel, Nicholas) |
|
7 | 7
trial
Witness List
Wed 07/01 3:32 PM
WITNESS LIST by South Bend Nights, Inc. (Butler, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/06 2:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: witness list due 7/1/15; Discovery due by 9/1/2015 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 10/1/2015 Final Pretrial Order due 1/14/16. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2016 02:00 PM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds Trailing Trial Docket set for 2/2/2016 Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (Jury trial: 1 week) (CBet) |
|
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Wed 05/06 11:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 5/6/2015 (CBet) |
||
Friday, March 27, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Appear*
Fri 03/27 2:21 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR: Scheduling Conference set for 5/6/2015 10:00 AM before District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds (CBet) |
|
Thursday, March 26, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/26 7:18 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by All Defendants. (Butler, Patrick) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Thu 03/26 7:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick N. Butler on behalf of All Defendants. (Butler, Patrick) |
|
Wednesday, February 04, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued*
Wed 02/04 1:16 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *South Bend Nights, Inc.* (TMcg) |
|
notice
Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option
Wed 02/04 1:16 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (TMcg) |
||
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Civil Case - Complaint
Tue 02/03 5:32 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Tracy Reed against South Bend Nights, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5010112 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Washtenaw - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Roumel, Nicholas) |