Keeton v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James Lawrence King |
Referred: | Chris M Mcaliley |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-20442 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 04, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 03, 2015 8:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Arnstein & Lehr, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
G. Willy Davila
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The U.S. Food and Drug Administration's Center for Devices and Radiological Health (FDA's CDRH)
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey B. Shapiro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Neville M. Leslie
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David Krause
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gynecare Worldwide
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ethicon, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ethicon Sarl
|
|
Defendant
MD,FACOG Willy G Davila
|
|
Defendant
MD Delos Cosgrove
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cleveland Clinic Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mr. Peter Cecchini
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lana C. Keeton
1602 Alton Rd. #423
Miami Beach, FL 33139 |
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 31, 2016 | ||
87 | 87
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/31 9:07 AM
FINAL ORDEROF DISMISSAL. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/31/2016. (jw) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2016 | ||
86 | 86
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Tue 03/29 4:07 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to82 Report and Recommendations by Lana C. Keeton. (mc) |