Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Edward G Smith
Case #: 2:15-cv-00552
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Feb 04, 2015
Terminated:Jun 18, 2015
Last checked: Friday Feb 06, 2015 8:10 AM EST
Defendant
CAROLYN W. COLVIN
Interested Party
SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION
Plaintiff
JOSE PELLOT
Represented By
MICHAEL PATRICK BOYLE
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, September 05, 2019
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Thu 09/05 11:33 AM
ORDER THAT THE COURT AUTHORIZES A PAYMENT TO MICHAEL PATRICK BOYLE, ESQUIRE, IN THE AMOUNT OF FOURTEEN THOUSAND, ONE HUNDRED SEVENTY-SEVEN DOLLARS AND 62/00 CENTS ($14,177.62) IN ATTORNEY'S FEES BEING WITHHELD FROM PLAINTIFFS PAST-DUE BENEFITS FOR COURT-RELATED SERVICES, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 9/5/19.9/5/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
18 18 respm Response to Motion Wed 09/04 4:17 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re17 MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. Section 406 (b) filed by CAROLYN W. COLVIN. (LYNCH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2019
17 17 motion Attorney Fees Tue 08/27 6:28 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees under 42 U.S.C. Section 406 (b) filed by JOSE PELLOT.Memorandum, Certificate of Service, Exhibits.(BOYLE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix A to I
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
16 16 order Order Thu 07/02 11:17 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF, JOSE A. PELLOT, IS AWARDED TWO THOUSAND, FIVE HUNDRED AND NINETY-TWO DOLLARS AND 71/00 CENTS ($2,592.71) IN ATTORNEY FEES UNDER THE EAJA. THESE ATTORNEY FEES WILL BE PAID DIRECTLY TO PLAINTIFF, JOSE A. PELLOT, AND SENT TO THE BUSINESS ADDRESS OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, MICHAEL PATRICK BOYLE, ESQUIRE. FULL OR PARTIAL REMITTANCE OF THE AWARDED ATTORNEY FEES WILL BE CONTINGENT UPON A DETERMINATION BY THE GOVERNMENT THAT PLAINTIFF OWES NO QUALIFYING, PRE-EXISTING DEBT( S) TO THE GOVERNMENT. IF SUCH A DEBT( S) EXISTS, THE GOVERNMENT WILL REDUCE THE AWARDED ATTORNEY FEES IN THIS ORDER TO THE EXTENT NECESSARY TO SATISFY SUCH DEBT(S). SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 7/1/15. 7/2/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Response to Motion Wed 07/01 1:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re14 MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by CAROLYN W. COLVIN. (LYNCH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 29, 2015
14 14 motion Attorney Fees Mon 06/29 4:15 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act filed by JOSE PELLOT.Memorandum, Affidavits, Certificate of Service.(BOYLE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2015
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Mon 06/22 2:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by US Marshals Service re: served Summons upon Attorney General by Certified Mail on 3/17/15. (va, )
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Mon 06/22 2:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by US Marshals Service re: served Summons upon Carolyn Colvin by Certified Mail on 3/18/15. (va, )
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Remand Thu 06/18 3:02 PM
ORDER THAT THE9 MOTION IS GRANTED, AND THIS CASE IS REMANDED TO DEFENDANT FOR FURTHER ADMINISTRATIVE PROCEEDINGS. UPON REMAND, THE APPEALS COUNCIL WILL FURTHER EVALUATE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND/OR DIRECT AN ADMINISTRATIVE LAW JUDGE TO FURTHER EVALUATE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM. THIS REMAND IS ORDERED PURSUANT TO THE FOURTH SENTENCE OF 42 U.S.C. § 405(G). THIS IS A FINAL ORDER. THIS CASE IS HEREBY CLOSED ON THE COURT'S DOCKET. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 6/18/15. 6/18/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order Thu 06/18 2:47 PM
ORDER THAT FINAL JUDGMENT OF THIS COURT IS ENTERED PURSUANT TO RULE 58 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 6/18/15. 6/18/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mas, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
9 9 motion Remand Mon 06/15 5:28 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by CAROLYN W. COLVIN.Proposed Order, Judgment Order, Certificate of Service.(LYNCH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 20, 2015
8 8 motion Brief and Statement Wed 05/20 5:58 PM
Plaintiff's Brief and Statement of Issues in Support of Request for Review filed by JOSE PELLOT.Certificate of Service.(BOYLE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 20, 2015
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/20 3:39 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by CAROLYN W. COLVIN.(LITTMAN, M.)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
6 6 misc Administrative Record Fri 04/17 3:45 PM
Administrative Record .(LITTMAN, M.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Court transcript index,
Att: 2 Appendix Documents related to administrative process including transcript of oral hearing, if applicable,
Att: 3 Appendix Payment documents and decisions,
Att: 4 Appendix Jurisdictional documents and notices,
Att: 5 Appendix Non disability related development,
Att: 6 Appendix Diability related development,
Att: 7 Appendix Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 8 Appendix Medical Records Part 2,
Att: 9 Appendix Medical Records Part 3,
Att: 10 Appendix Medial Records Part 4
Wednesday, February 18, 2015
5 5 service Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Wed 02/18 2:24 PM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (ems)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
4 4 misc Procedural Order Wed 02/11 4:43 PM
Procedural Order 2/11/15 Entered and copies mailed and emailed. (er, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
3 3 cmp Complaint Wed 02/11 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT against CAROLYN W. COLVIN, filed by JOSE PELLOT.(er, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CIVIL COVER SHEETS
2 2 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 02/11 10:40 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO PROCEED IN IN FORMA PAUPERIS (DOC. NO. 1) IS GRANTED. THE COMPLAINT IS TO BE FILED AND SUMMONS IS TO BE ISSUED, AND THE UNITED STATES MARSHAL FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA SHALL SERVE THE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT UPON THE DEFENDANT AT NO COST TO THE PLAINTIFF. SIGNED BY HONORABLE EDWARD G. SMITH ON 2/10/15.2/11/15 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(er, )
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 02/11 10:47 AM
Summons Issued as to CAROLYN W. COLVIN. 2 Originals Forwarded To: U.S. Marshal on 2/10/15. 1 Original to U.S. Attorney's office. (er, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 04, 2015
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 02/05 2:53 PM
MOTION AND STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by JOSE PELLOT..(rt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet