California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Referred: Joseph C Spero
Case #: 3:15-cv-00569
Nature of Suit385 Torts - Personal Property - Property Damage Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2015
Terminated:Nov 17, 2016
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 04, 2015 7:18 AM PDT
Defendant
Nestle Purina Pet Care Company
a Missouri corporation 1 Checkerboard Square
St. Louis, MO 63164
Represented By
Dale Joseph Giali
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Andrea M Weiss
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Keri Elizabeth Borders
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Carmine R. Zarlenga, III
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Colello
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frank Lucido
San Francisco, CA 94111
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
James Dennis Young
Morgan And Morgan
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
John A. Yanchunis
Morgan And Morgan, P.A.
contact info
Karl Richard Molineux
Merrill, Nomura & Molineux
contact info
Susan S. Brown
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Hickey
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Pat Kelly
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kacy Kimball
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sharon Normand
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Normand
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
America Pena
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Phillips
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Diane Porter
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Rodarte
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Reggie Smith
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Christina Winters
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Cynthia Xenakis
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Carter
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Daniel A. Edelman
Edelman Combs Latturner & Goodwin, LLC
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lance Carlson
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurae Campbell
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Almaceo Campbell
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Virginia Burgardt
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Bryden
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Regina Bollinger
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Ricky Bisharat
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Robin Benham
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hope Benham
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Balmer
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Alan M. Mansfield
Whatley Kallas, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen Baker
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Grace Armstrong
Represented By
Michael Francis Ram
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski LLP
contact info
David Pastor
Pastor Law Office LLP
contact info
Jeffrey B. Cereghino
Ram, Olson, Cereghino & Kopczynski
contact info
Roger L Mandel
Lackey Hershman LLP
contact info
Beth E. Terrell
Terrell Marshall Daudt & Willie PLLC
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2015
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Frank Lucido, Motions terminated: 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Amended Complaint filed by Frank Lucido, 31 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RE: FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Frank Lucido.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/24/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2015)
GPO Aug 10 2015
STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2015)
GPO Nov 09 2015
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO 4 PLAINTIFFS ONLY re 71 Stipulation filed by Reggie Smith, Regina Bollinger, Jennifer Hickey. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/9/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2015)
GPO Dec 14 2015
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal of Plaintiff Richard Carter Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Nestle Purina Pet Care Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/14/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2015)
GPO Jan 12 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 77 Stipulation for dismissal for Plaintiffs David Balmer, Pat Kelly, Karen Baker only. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/12/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2016)
GPO Mar 14 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER 79: Further Case Management Conference continued from 4/28/3016 to 5/5/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Conference Statement due 4/28/2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2016)
GPO May 09 2016
NOTICE OF REFERENCE AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/9/16. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
GPO May 20 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER 92 RE EXCHANGE OF EXPERT REPORTS. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/20/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2016)
GPO Jun 06 2016
ORDER Re 99 Plaintiffs' Letter of June 3, 2016. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/6/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2016)
GPO Jul 01 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER Re MSJ schedule and page limits. Motion Hearing set for 10/27/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2016)
GPO Aug 10 2016
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 Stipulation for Dismissal of Counts 44 and 45 only filed by Nestle Purina Pet Care Company. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/10/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2016)
GPO Sep 02 2016
ORDER DENYING STIPULATION AND ORDER re 129 to (1) Set a Briefing Scheduling for the Motions to Strike Expert Testimony; etc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/2/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2016)
GPO Sep 16 2016
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 109 Defendant's Motion to Strike Supplemental Expert Report of Dr. Questen. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2016)
GPO Sep 28 2016
ORDER re 154 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/28/2016. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2016)
GPO Oct 06 2016
SECOND ORDER re 154 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs' motion is granted in part and deferred in part. Defendant shall file a more specific declaration within a week.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/6/2016. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2016)
GPO Oct 13 2016
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 154 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (emclc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2016)
GPO Nov 17 2016
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (1) Granting 114 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 110 124 Defendant's Motions to Exclude the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Dr. Questen and Dr. Tegzes; and (3) Denying 215 217 219 Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record and Motion to Shorten Time. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)

1. Lawsuit claims Purina brand is killing dogs (usatoday.com)
Submitted Wed 02/25/2015
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, November 23, 2016
224 224 order Order on Stipulation Wed 11/23 3:02 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 223 STIPULATION RE CONTINUATION OFDEADLINES PURSUANT TO FED. R.CIV. PROC. 54 AND L-R 7-8 AND 54-1. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2016)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 22, 2016
223 223 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 11/22 4:15 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re222 Judgment re Continuation of Deadlines Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 54 and L-R 7-8 and 54-1 filed by Nestle Purina Pet Care Company. (Weiss, Andrea) (Filed on 11/22/2016)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2016
222 222 order Judgment Thu 11/17 12:16 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/17/2016. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
Related: [-]
221 221 order Order on Motion to Strike Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Shorten Time Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/17 12:13 PM
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen (1) Granting 114 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; (2) Granting in Part and Denying in Part 110 124 Defendant's Motions to Exclude the Expert Report, Opinions, and Testimony of Dr. Questen and Dr. Tegzes; and (3) Denying 215 217 219 Plaintiffs' Motion to Supplement the Record and Motion to Shorten Time. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2016)
Related: [-]