Town & Country Masonry and Tuckpointing, LLC
Missouri Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Barry S Schermer |
Case #: | 4:15-bk-40776 |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2015 |
Dismissed: | Mar 09, 2016 |
Terminated: | Mar 24, 2016 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Town & Country Masonry and Tuckpointing, LLC
2346 Palm St
Saint Louis, MO 63107-3535 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of US Trustee
111 S Tenth St, Ste 6.353
St. Louis, MO 63102 |
1. | Tuckpointing business files bankruptcy - St. Louis Business Journal (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Wed 02/11/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 24, 2016 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 03/24 1:00 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (sch, m) |