Texas Western District Court
Judge:Xavier Rodriguez
Case #: 5:15-cv-00107
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2015
Terminated:May 07, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Aug 09, 2015 6:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Accenture, LLP
Represented By
Shannon B. Schmoyer
Schmoyer Reinhard LLP
contact info
Justin James Barbour
Schmoyer Reinhard LLP
contact info
Defendant
Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc. d/b/a BC Forward
Defendant
Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc.
Represented By
Charles A. Daughtry
Daughtry & Jordan, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kimberly Towell
Represented By
Alfonso Kennard, Jr.
Kennard, Blankenship & Robinson, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Thursday, May 07, 2015
15 15 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 05/07 2:28 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kimberly Towell. (Kennard, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 27, 2015
14 14 order Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Hearings Mon 04/27 11:29 AM
ORDER, that the Parties shall submit a stiplulation of dismissal or an Agreed Judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before May 15, 2015. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
13 13 misc Advisory to the Court Thu 04/23 11:24 AM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Kimberly Towell. (Kennard, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
12 12 order Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order Notice of Right to Consent to Magistrate Trial Wed 03/11 3:04 PM
Order and Advisory. Plaintiff shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court by 4/11/2015. Notice of right to consent to disposition of a civil case by a U.S. Magistrate Judge.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Wed 03/11 10:42 AM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc.. (Daughtry, Charles)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/11 10:15 AM
Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc. d/b/a BC Forward's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint of Kimberly Towell . Attorney Charles A. Daughtry added to party Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc.(pty:dft) by Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc..(Daughtry, Charles)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2015
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 03/06 2:35 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Accenture, LLP. (Schmoyer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/06 2:31 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Shannon B. Schmoyer added to party Accenture, LLP(pty:dft) by Accenture, LLP.(Schmoyer, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/03 4:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Towell. Accenture, LLP served on 2/13/2015, answer due 3/6/2015; Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc. served on 2/17/2015, answer due 3/10/2015. (Kennard, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 02/13 1:03 PM
CORRECTED Summons Issued as to Accenture, LLP, Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc. d/b/a BC Forward. (wg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 12, 2015
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 02/12 1:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kimberly Towell. Corrected (Kennard, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 02/11 4:40 PM
Summons Issued as to Accenture, LLP, Bucher and Christian Consulting, Inc. d/b/a BC Forward. (wg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/10 5:27 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kimberly Towell. to Accenture, LLP (Kennard, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/10 5:26 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Kimberly Towell. (Kennard, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/10 5:09 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-7195847), filed by Kimberly Towell.(Kennard, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 02/11 9:17 AM
Case Randomly Assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (wg)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Wed 02/11 9:18 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (wg)
Related: [-]