Washington Western District Court
Judge:Ricardo S Martinez
Case #: 2:15-cv-00199
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2015
Terminated:May 01, 2017
Last checked: Sunday Aug 09, 2015 4:40 AM PDT
Defendant
Spankbang.com
Defendant
John Does 1 - 20
Defendant
Seyed Fariborz Hossei Fard
Defendant
Nivun Pte Ltd
Plaintiff
Hydentra HLP Int. Limited
Represented By
Spencer D Freeman
Freeman Law Firm Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Hydentra HLP Int Limited
Represented By
Spencer D Freeman
Freeman Law Firm Inc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, December 01, 2017
8 8 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Fri 12/01 2:42 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office. (PM)
Related: [-]
7 7 utility Report Regarding Patent/Trademark/Copyright Fri 12/01 2:36 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action Mailed to the US Copyright Office. (PM)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) Mon 08/31 3:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiff Hydentra HLP Int Limited (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/01 12:16 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Defendants, filed by Hydentra HLP Int Limited.(Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
4 4 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/13 10:36 AM
ORDER denying pltf's ex parte3 Motion for leave to take expedited discovery by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 03/16 11:55 AM
MOTION Leave for Early Discovery by Plaintiff Hydentra HLP Int Limited. Noting Date 3/16/2015, (Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 11, 2015
2 2 utility Report Regarding Patent & Trademark Wed 02/11 12:06 PM
REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (ST)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 02/11 11:54 AM
Judge Ricardo S Martinez added. (ST)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation/Remark (public entry) Wed 02/11 12:11 PM
Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright sent to the Copyright Office via U.S. Postal Service. (ST)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 10, 2015
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/10 4:13 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Spankbang.com Related [+] Attorney Spencer D Freeman added to party Hydentra HLP Int. Limited(pty:pla), filed by Hydentra HLP Int. Limited.(Freeman, Spencer)
Related: [-] ceipt # 0981-3906275
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Corporate Disclosure,
Att: 3 A120 - Trademark,
Att: 4 A121 - Copyright,
Att: 5 A121 - Copyright,
Att: 6 A121 - Copyright,
Att: 7 A121 - Copyright,
Att: 8 A121- Copyright,
Att: 9 A121 - Copyright