Confederated Tribes, et al v. Sally Jewell, et al
Original Case: 1:13-cv-00849
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:15-cvus-05033 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Case Filed: | Feb 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jul 29, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 01, 2016 7:13 AM EDT |
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
Jamestown S'Klallam Tribe
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Appellee
United South and Eastern Tribes, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Amicus Curiae for Respondent
Samish Indian Nation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Kevin K. Washburn, in his official capacity as Assistant Secretary - Indian Affairs of the United States Department of the Interior
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Tracie Stevens, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
National Indian Gaming Commission, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bureau of Indian Affairs, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
United States Department of the Interior
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Stanley M. Speaks, in his official capacity as Regional Director, Northwest Region, of the Bureau of Indian Affairs
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
Sally Jewell, in her official capacity as Secretary of the United States Department of the Interior
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor for Defendant - Appellee
Cowlitz Indian Tribe, a federally recognized Indian Tribe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Michels Development, LLC, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Dragonslayer, Inc., In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Susan Gilbert, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Greg Gilbert, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Al Alexanderson, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Citizens Against Reservation Shopping (Cars), In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
City of Vancouver, Washington, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Clark County, Washington, In case no.: 13-cv-850
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Confederated Tribes of the Grand Ronde Community of Oregon
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 29 2016
OPINION [1627614] filed (Pages: 32) for the Court by Judge Wilkins. [14-5326, 15-5033] |
Docket last updated: 08/01/2016 7:13 AM EDT |
Tuesday, February 10, 2015 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 15-5033 | ||
NOTICE OF APPEAL filed [1536855] by Al Alexanderson, Citizens Against Reservation Shopping (Cars), City of Vancouver, Washington, Clark County, Washington, Dragonslayer, Inc., Greg Gilbert, Susan Gilbert and Michels Development, LLC seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:13-cv-00849-BJR. Assigned USCA Case Number 15-5033 |