Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gene Ek Pratter
Referred: Carol Sandra Moore Wells
Case #: 5:15-cv-00653
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2015
Terminated:Sep 03, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Feb 12, 2015 6:28 AM EST
Petitioner
BARRETT Q. GRIGGS
#93735 38 N. 4TH STREET
ALLENTOWN, PA 18102
Respondent
KELLY BANACH
Respondent
DAVID HOWELLS
Respondent
RONALD MANESCU

GPO Sep 03 2015
ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED; THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (DOC. NO. 1) IS DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST STATE COURT REMEDIES; AND THERE IS NO PROBABLE CAUSE TO ISSUE A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES, INCLUDING STATISTICS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/2/15. 9/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER, E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, September 16, 2015
utility Returned Mail Thu 09/17 10:46 AM
Copy of Order dated 9/2/15 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to BARRETT Q. GRIGGS for the following reason: Return to sender, insufficient address, not here. (pr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2015
16 16 order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Thu 09/03 2:27 PM
ORDER THAT THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS APPROVED AND ADOPTED; THE PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (DOC. NO. 1) IS DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, FOR FAILURE TO EXHAUST STATE COURT REMEDIES; AND THERE IS NO PROBABLE CAUSE TO ISSUE A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THIS CASE CLOSED FOR ALL PURPOSES, INCLUDING STATISTICS.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 9/2/15. 9/3/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER, E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 02, 2015
15 15 notice Notice re: Report and Recommendation Thu 07/02 4:10 PM
***(Court Only) Civ624 Notice to the Court regarding Report and Recommendation.(pr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 26, 2015
utility Returned Mail Fri 06/26 4:21 PM
Copy of Order dated 6/17/15 and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to BARRETT Q. GRIGGS for the following reason: Return to sender, not here. (pr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
14 14 order Stipulation and Order Wed 06/17 4:15 PM
ORDER THAT RESPONDENTS MOTION TO DIMISS AND STRIKE FROM THE CAPTION AS INAPPROPRIATE PARTIES TO A HABEAS CORPUS PEITION IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/17/2015. 6/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 06/17 4:09 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by BARRETT Q. GRIGGS. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 6/17/2015. 6/17/2015 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE AND E-MAILED.(sg, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 PROPOSED ORDER,
Att: 2 NOTICE
Monday, June 08, 2015
12 12 respoth Response Mon 06/08 11:44 AM
Response In Opposition to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, along with Certificate of Service, by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF LEHIGH COUNTY. (GALLAGHER, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 30, 2015
11 11 misc Objections Fri 05/01 11:28 AM
Objection to order and grant of enlargement of time to file an answer filed by BARRETT Q. GRIGGS. Cert. of Service. (pr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 29, 2015
10 10 order Order Setting Answer Deadline Wed 04/29 2:13 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER8 IS GRANTED. RESPONDENT SHALL FILE HIS ANSWER TO THE HABEAS PETITION BY 6/10/2015. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 4/23/15. 4/29/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED PRO SE, E-MAILED.(gs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 04/23 1:18 PM
ORDER THAT THE RESPONDENT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER IS GRANTED. RESPONDENT SHALL FILE HIS ANSWER TO THE HABEAS PETITIN ON OR BEFORE 6/10/15. DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF LEHIGH COUNTY answer due 6/10/2015.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 4/23/15.4/23/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER, E-MAILED TO COUNSEL.(pr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 22, 2015
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 04/22 4:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Pro se Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF LEHIGH COUNTY.Certificate of Service.Motions referred to CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS.(GALLAGHER, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 13, 2015
7 7 motion Dismiss Mon 04/13 2:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Strike from Caption as Inapropriate filed by KELLY BANACH, DAVID HOWELLS, RONALD MANESCU.Memorandum of Law and Certificate of Service.Motions referred to CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS.(GALE, MARTHA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 09, 2015
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/09 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER F. GALLAGHER on behalf of DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF LEHIGH COUNTY with Certificate of Service(GALLAGHER, HEATHER)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 27, 2015
5 5 order Order to Answer Mon 03/30 11:59 AM
ORDER THAT THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF LEHIGH COUNTY IS ADDED AS A PARTY RESPONDENT AND THE CAPTION IS HEREBY SO AMENDED. THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY SHALL FILE SPECIFIC AND DETAILED ANSWERS WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS FROM THE DATE OF THIS ORDER PURSUANT TO RULE 5, 28 USC, FOL. SECTION 2254.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS ON 3/27/15. 3/30/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER AND RESPONDENTS.(pr, )
Related: [-]
utility Remark Mon 03/30 12:01 PM
Copies of petition mailed to petitioner and respondents. (pr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2015
4 4 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/20 3:58 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED MATTER IS REFERRED TO THE HONORABELE CAROL SANDRA MOORE WELLS, CHIEF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 3/20/15. 3/20/15 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(jpd, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 12, 2015
3 3 misc Application/Petition Fri 03/13 11:02 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS by BARRETT Q. GRIGGS. (kp, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 24, 2015
2 2 order Order Wed 02/25 12:16 PM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT FURNISH PETITIONER WITH AN APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS; AND, WITHIN 30 DAYS PETITIONER SHALL COMPLETE AND RETURN THE APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS TO THE CLERK OF COURT OR REMIT THE REQUIRED $5.00 FILING FEE, FAILING WHICH THIS CIVIL ACTION WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE TO PETITIONER. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 2/23/15. 2/25/15 ENTERED AND COPIES WITH IFP FORM MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER. (va, )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 09, 2015
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 02/11 10:23 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by BARRETT Q. GRIGGS.(tj, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheets,
Att: 2 Envelope