California Northern District Court
Judge:William Alsup
Case #: 3:15-cv-00382
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2015
Terminated:Nov 02, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 4:45 AM PDT
Counter-claimant
Joseph Lonsdale
Represented By
Joseph Friedman Tartakovsky
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Brenda R. Sharton
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Kristen Garcia Dumont
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Aldridge
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Sarah M Vacchiano
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Farris
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Counter-defendant
Elise Clougherty
Represented By
John C Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook
contact info
Jonathan David Grunberg
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer Lin Liu
The Liu Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
David Mead Ehrlich
contact info
L. Lin Wood
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Joseph Lonsdale
Represented By
Joseph Friedman Tartakovsky
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Laura Kathryn O'Boyle
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Brenda R. Sharton
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Orin Snyder
Gibson Dunn And Crutcher
contact info
Kristen Garcia Dumont
Goodwin Procter LLP
contact info
Emily Catherine Aldridge
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Sarah M Vacchiano
Gibson, Dunn And Crutcher LLP
contact info
Joseph Richard Farris
Arnold & Porter LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Elise Clougherty
Represented By
John C Clune
Hutchinson Black And Cook
contact info
Jonathan David Grunberg
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer Lin Liu
The Liu Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
David Mead Ehrlich
contact info
L. Lin Wood
L. Lin Wood, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Formation8 GP, LLC
Terminated: 03/05/2015
Represented By
Rebekah Leigh Punak
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
John Watkins Keker
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Defendant
Formation8 Partners, LLC
Terminated: 03/05/2015
Represented By
Rebekah Leigh Punak
Keker & Van Nest, LLP
contact info
John Watkins Keker
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info
Elliot Remsen Peters
Keker & Van Nest LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 06 2015
ORDER RE COUNTERCLAIMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2015)
GPO Mar 09 2015
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 36 Clerk's Notice Continuing Motion Hearing, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
GPO Mar 10 2015
ORDER RE 31 30 MOTIONS TO DISMISS.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 3/10/2015. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2015)
GPO Mar 23 2015
ORDER DENYING PRO HACVICE APPLICATION OFATTORNEY SARAHVACCHIANO(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
GPO Mar 23 2015
43 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
GPO Mar 23 2015
ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2015)
GPO Mar 27 2015
49 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2015)
GPO Apr 01 2015
ORDER DENYING PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY BRENDA SHARTON.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2015)
GPO Apr 07 2015
ORDER Granting 54 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2015) Modified on 4/7/2015 (dtmS, COURT STAFF).
GPO Apr 30 2015
ORDER RE 48 MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMS.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2015)
GPO Jun 01 2015
ORDER GRANTING 66 APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2015)
GPO Jun 02 2015
ORDER RE MOTION TO AMEND COUNTERCLAIMS 68.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
GPO Jun 02 2015
JOINT STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR AND MODIFYING CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULE TOEXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE AND ORDER 67.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2015)
GPO Jun 29 2015
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS 75.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)

1. Woman drops sex assault case against U.S. venture capitalist (venturebeat.com)
Submitted Mon 11/02/2015
Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, November 02, 2015
79 79 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 11/02 10:00 AM
STIPULATION VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS CLAIMS AND DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE AND TERMINATING ACTION filed by Joseph Lonsdale. (Aldridge, Emily) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
Related: [-]