California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Alan Jaroslovsky
Case #: 1:15-bk-10150
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2015
Terminated:Feb 02, 2021
Plan Confirmed:Mar 10, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Deerfield Ranch Winery, LLC, Debtor
1310 Warm Springs Rd
Glen Ellen, CA 95442-9709
Represented By
Scott H. McNutt
Mcnutt Law Group LLP
contact info
Shane J. Moses
Mcnutt Law Group LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SR
235 Pine St. #700
San Francisco, CA 94104


1. Deerfield files bankruptcy reorganization plan (kenwoodpress.com)
Submitted Mon 11/16/2015
2. The Kenwood Press - Bankruptcy filing gives Deerfield a lifeline (kenwoodpress.com)
Submitted Mon 03/02/2015
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Wednesday, February 03, 2021
283 283 audio audio Wed 02/03 8:55 PM
The Audio File attached to the PDF includes several hearings. Court Date & Time [ 2/3/2021 11:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 2140 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:14 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
282 282 notice Notice of Entry of Order Wed 02/03 1:04 PM
Notice of Entry of Order Regarding: Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Deerfield Ranch Winery, LLC (Califano, Peter)
Related: [-] 281 Order Re-Closing Case and Granting Other, Related Relief (Related Doc280 Joint Ex Parte Motion of Rabo and Deerfield to Re-Close Case), (Related Doc256 Motion to Appoint Vito Mitria of Beacon Management Advisors as Plan Administrator Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC) (Motion to appoint plan administrator deemed withdrawn.) (ds)
court Hearing Held (Bk) Wed 02/03 11:08 AM
Hearing Held 2/3/2021 at 11:00 A.M. via Zoom Webinar Related [+] Minutes: OFF CALENDAR. Before hearing, An Order Re-Closing Case and Granting Other, Related Relief was signed and entered on 2/2/2021. (rba)
Related: [-] 256 Motion Miscellaneous Relief filed by Rabo AgriFinance LLC
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
281 281 order Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/02 2:11 PM
Order Re-Closing Case and Granting Other, Related Relief Related [+], (Motion to appoint plan administrator deemed withdrawn.) (ds)
Related: [-] 280 Joint Ex Parte Motion of Rabo and Deerfield to Re-Close Case256 Motion to Appoint Vito Mitria of Beacon Management Advisors as Plan Administrator Filed by Creditor Rabo AgriFinance LLC
court Close Bankruptcy Case Tue 02/02 2:12 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (ds)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 01, 2021
280 280 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/01 3:44 PM
Ex Parte Motion STIPULATION AND JOINT EX PARTE MOTION OF RABO AND DEERFIELD TO RE-CLOSE CASE, AND FOR OTHER RELATED RELIEF Filed by Creditor Rabobank, N.A. (Califano, Peter)
Related: [-]