California Central District Court
Judge:Andrew J Guilford
Referred: Douglas F Mccormick
Case #: 8:15-cv-00261
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2015
Terminated:Sep 30, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 12, 2015 6:45 AM PDT
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By
Heidi Larson Howell
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Marisa L Dye
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Douglas Roger Hart
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jennifer B Zargarof
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
Garfield Beach CVS LLC
Represented By
Heidi Larson Howell
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Marisa L Dye
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Douglas Roger Hart
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Jennifer B Zargarof
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Represented By
Heidi Larson Howell
Sidley Austin LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Ceja
Represented By
Michael C Righetti
Righetti Glugoski PC
contact info
John Glugoski
Righetti Glugoski PC
contact info
Matthew Righetti
Righetti Glugoski PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 30, 2015
19 19 order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 10/01 3:11 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Stipulation of Dismissal18 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: Pursuant to the stipulation of the Parties, the Court hereby orders that the above-captioned matter is dismissed in its entirety, each side to bear its/his own costs and attorneys' fees. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lwag)
Related: [-]
18 18 stip Dismiss Case Wed 09/30 6:17 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS LLC.(Howell, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 06, 2015
17 17 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 07/06 10:50 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER SPECIFYING PROCEDURES: Discovery cut-off 11/23/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2016 at 8:30 am. Bench Trial set for 2/23/2016 at 9:00 am. (lb)
Related: [-]
16 16 minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 07/06 10:48 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held: Discovery cut-off 11/23/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2016 at 8:30 am. Bench Trial set for 2/23/2016 at 9:00 am.Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
15 15 order Order Mon 06/15 11:49 AM
ORDER Granting Stipulated Protective Order Re Use of Confidential Information8 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulated Protective Order Re Use of Confidential Information filed with this Court on June 8, 2015, the Order is hereby granted. (lwag)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order Mon 06/15 11:43 AM
ORDER to Continue Scheduling Conference13 by Judge Andrew J. Guilford: In light of the foregoing stipulation and good cause appearing therefore, the scheduling conference in this matter will be rescheduled for July 6, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. (lwag)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 12, 2015
13 13 stip Continue Fri 06/12 4:27 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from June 22, 2015 to July 6, 2015 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice 9 filed by Plaintiff Paul Ceja.(Righetti, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Michael Righetti In Support of Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference
12 12 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Fri 06/12 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error, the document attached as Dkt. 11 by counsel included irrelevant and improper attachments, the document has been replaced with the corrected document. (ts)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Lodging
Thursday, June 11, 2015
11 11 notice Notice of Lodging Thu 06/11 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed PROPOSED ORDER re Stipulation for Protective Order,8 (Larson Howell, Heidi)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Appearance Thu 06/11 4:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Heidi Catherine Larson Howell on behalf of Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., DOES, Garfield Beach CVS LLC (Attorney Heidi Catherine Larson Howell added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi Catherine Larson Howell added to party DOES(pty:dft), Attorney Heidi Catherine Larson Howell added to party Garfield Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Larson Howell, Heidi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
9 9 testxtonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/09 11:55 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE: On the Court's own motion, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 6/15/2015 at 9:00 am is continued to 6/22/2015 at 9:00 am.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lb)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 08, 2015
8 8 stip Protective Order Mon 06/08 6:27 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS LLC.(Attorney Douglas Roger Hart added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Douglas Roger Hart added to party Garfield Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Hart, Douglas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Status Report Mon 06/08 6:23 PM
STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Hart, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
6 6 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 04/21 2:28 PM
ORDER RE EARLY MEETING OF PARTIES AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2015 at 09:00 AM before Judge Andrew J. Guilford. (nbo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 02/17 2:44 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (nbo)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 02/17 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andrew J. Guilford and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (nbo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 13, 2015
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 02/13 1:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Dye, Marisa)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 02/13 1:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS LLC, identifying CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS, LLC, CVS Health Corporation, Sidley Austin LLP, Paul Ceja, Righetti Glugoski, PC. (Dye, Marisa)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 02/13 1:41 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California County of Orange, case number 30-2014 00737588-CU Receipt No: 0973-15213190 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Garfield Beach CVS LLC. (Attorney Marisa L Dye added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Marisa L Dye added to party Garfield Beach CVS LLC(pty:dft))(Dye, Marisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint,
Att: 3 Declaration Melanie Luker In Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Declaration Marisa Dye In Support of Defendants' Notice of Removal