California Northern District Court
Judge:Paul Singh Grewal
Case #: 3:15-cv-00693
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2015
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 12, 2015 6:50 AM PDT
Defendant
Alec Farwell
Represented By
David Richard Schwartz
Schwartz Rimberg, LLP
contact info
Jeff David Neiderman
Schwartz Rimberg, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Edward James Herzstock
Represented By
David Richard Schwartz
Schwartz Rimberg, LLP
contact info
Jeff David Neiderman
Schwartz Rimberg, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Shirish Gupta
JAMS 2 Embarcadero Center Suite 1500
San Francisco, CA 94111
Plaintiff
Yelp Inc.
Represented By
Zachary J. Alinder
Sideman & Bancroft LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Melissa Scheinwald
Terminated: 04/24/2015

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, February 13, 2015
6 6 misc Proposed Summons Fri 02/13 1:57 PM
Proposed Summons. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons Fri 02/13 1:55 PM
Proposed Summons. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons Fri 02/13 1:54 PM
Proposed Summons. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Fri 02/13 1:49 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities Fri 02/13 1:48 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Yelp Inc. re1 Complaint, (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/13 1:20 PM
COMPLAINT against EDWARD JAMES HERZSTOCK, ALEC FARWELL and MELISSA SCHEINWALD, individuals, doing business as YELPDIRECTOR, REVPLEY, and REVLEAP, and DOES 1-20, against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-9288937.). Filed byYelp Inc..(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet