LBDS Holding Company, LLC v. ISOL Technology Inc. et al
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard Davis |
Case #: | 6:11-cv-00428 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 16, 2011 |
Terminated: | May 15, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 26, 2017 6:19 AM CST |
Defendant
Chang-Beom Ahn
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ISOL Technology Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yong-sik Kim
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Heung-kyu Lee
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Medivalley Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeong-il Park
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Jeff Kaplan
JAMS Inc 8401 N Central Expressway Suite 610
Dallas, TX 75225 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Davis
|
|
Plaintiff
LBDS Holding Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 06/07 2:47 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule CV-79(b) trial exhibits (03.05.2014 - 03.12.2014) have been destroyed (rlf) |