Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:15-bk-10327
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2015
Terminated:May 18, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Oct 30, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Saladworks, LLC
161 Washington St Ste 300
Conshohocken, PA 19428-2085
Represented By
Kerri K. Mumford
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Adam G. Landis
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899


1. Saladworks Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Protection (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 02/17/2015
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
788 788 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED) - Notice Wed 05/18 10:13 AM
Amended HEARING CANCELLED/RESCHEDULED. Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing. Related [+] Filed by SW Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. (Cianciulli, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 782
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 05/18 1:28 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2016
787 787 order Final Decree Tue 05/17 2:23 PM
Order Granting SW Liquidating Trust's Motion for an Order Granting a Final Decree and Closing the Case Order Signed on 5/17/2016. (TC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 16, 2016
786 786 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Mon 05/16 4:15 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Related [+] Filed by SW Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/12/2016. (Cianciulli, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 782 ,785
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
785 785 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Mon 05/16 2:40 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Related [+] Filed by SW Liquidating Trust. Hearing scheduled for 5/24/2016 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #2, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/12/2016. (Cianciulli, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 782
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, May 13, 2016
784 784 misc Certificate of No Objection(Aty) Fri 05/13 12:53 PM
Certificate of No Objection Related [+] Filed by SW Liquidating Trust. (Cianciulli, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 782