Massachusetts Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Melvin S Hoffman
Case #: 1:15-bk-10534
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Mar 23, 2015
Terminated:Nov 29, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Reed and Barton Corporation
144 W Britannia St
Taunton, MA 02780-1634
Represented By
John J. Monaghan
Holland & Knight
contact info
Debtor
RB Liquidation, Inc. f/k/a Reed and Barton Corporation
144 W Britannia St
Taunton, MA 02780-1634
Represented By
John J. Monaghan
Holland & Knight
contact info
Lynne B. Xerras
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Assistant U.S. Trustee
John Fitzgerald
Office of the US Trustee J.W. McCormack Post Office & Courthouse 5 Post Office Sq., 10th Fl, Suite 1000
Boston, MA 02109
Represented By
Eric K. Bradford
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Steven D. Pohl
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee Chair
Rolf Poeting
Rolfe Glass 402 East Main Street
Mount Pleasant, PA 15666
Trustee
Craig Jalbert, the Creditors' Trustee
Represented By
John J. Monaghan
Holland & Knight
contact info
Lynne B. Xerras
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Steven D. Pohl
Brown Rudnick LLP
contact info


1. John Kostrzewa: Reed & Barton bankruptcy marks end of an era (providencejournal.com)
Submitted Mon 03/02/2015
2. Silver City no more? Taunton's Reed & Barton files for bankruptcy (wcvb.com)
Submitted Fri 02/20/2015
Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Thursday, January 19, 2017
548 548 misc Certificate of Compliance/Non Compliance Thu 01/19 10:29 AM
Certificate of Compliance Certification by Creditors' Trustee of Completion of Plan Disbursements and Distributions with certificate of service Related [+] filed by Trustee Craig Jalbert, the Creditors' Trustee (Xerras, Lynne)
Related: [-] 546 Order on Motion for Final Decree