Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Douglas P Woodlock
Case #: 1:15-cv-10438
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446 Breach of Contract- Insurance
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2015
Terminated:Jul 01, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Aug 16, 2015 10:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014
Represented By
Stephen T. Melnick, III
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Michael Mankes
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Michael Erickson
Represented By
Stephen T. Melnick, III
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Michael Mankes
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Mujeeb Ijaz
Represented By
Stephen T. Melnick, III
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Michael Mankes
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Indrajeet Thorat
Represented By
Stephen T. Melnick, III
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Michael Mankes
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Depeng Wang
Represented By
Stephen T. Melnick, III
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Michael Mankes
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
A123 Systems Inc.
Represented By
Lyndsey M. Kruzer
Foley Hoag LLP
contact info
Michael L. Rosen
Foley Hoag LLP
contact info
Robert J. Bowes
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz P.L.L.
contact info
Robert S. Gilmore
Kohrman Jackson & Krantz P.L.L.
contact info

Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, July 01, 2015
41 41 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/01 11:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by A123 Systems Inc.. (Rosen, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 18, 2015
40 40 minutes Status Conference Thu 06/18 10:46 AM
ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: Status Conference held on 6/18/2015; confidentiality of settlement agreement addressed; parties request for the Court's jurisdiction over it addressed; Court not inclined to seal without further justification; Court declines to enter dismissal in it's present form. (Court Reporter: Brenda Hancock at brhancock@msn.com.)(Attorneys present: Bowes, Gilmore, and Rosen for the pltff; Mankes for the defts) (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 16, 2015
39 39 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 06/16 12:50 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/18/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge Douglas P. Woodlock. (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
38 38 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 06/15 12:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by A123 Systems Inc.. (Rosen, Michael) (Main Document 38 replaced on 6/15/2015) (Gioia, AnaMaria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 28, 2015
37 37 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/28 9:10 AM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting35 Assented to Fifth Motion for Extension of Time Until 6/17/15 to File Response re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; granting36 Assented to Fifth Motion for Extension of Time Until 6/18/15 to File Response re19 MOTION to Transfer Case . No further extensions shall be anticipated. (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/27 1:43 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/18/15 to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Transfer Case by A123 Systems Inc..(Rosen, Michael)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/27 1:41 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 6/17/15 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A123 Systems Inc..(Rosen, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 12, 2015
34 34 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 05/12 9:04 AM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting32 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 5/26/15 to File Response/Reply re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; granting33 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 5/27/15 to File Response/Reply re19 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 11, 2015
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/11 5:03 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/27/2015 to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Transfer Case by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/11 5:02 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/26/2015 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2015
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/22 9:25 AM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting29 Assented to Third Motion for Extension of Time Until 5/5/15 to File Response re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , granting30 Assented to Third Motion for Extension of Time Until 5/6/15 to File Response/Reply re19 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/21 10:14 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/6/2015 to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Transfer Case by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/21 10:13 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 5/5/2015 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 07, 2015
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/07 11:25 AM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting26 Plaintiff's Second Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 4/21/15 to File Response re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; granting27 Plaintiff's Second Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 4/22/15 to File Response re19 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 06, 2015
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/06 3:31 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/22/15 to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Transfer Case by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/06 3:29 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/21/15 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 23, 2015
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 03/23 11:40 AM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting23 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 4/7/15 to File Response re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; granting24 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 4/8/15 to File Response re19 MOTION to Transfer Case . (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 20, 2015
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/20 12:05 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/8/2015 to File Response/Reply as to19 MOTION to Transfer Case by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 03/20 12:03 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 4/7/2015 to File Response/Reply as to16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 17, 2015
22 22 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 03/17 8:50 AM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting21 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 16, 2015
21 21 motion Leave to File Document Mon 03/16 3:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 11, 2015
20 20 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 03/11 6:00 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re19 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Apple Inc., Michael Erickson, Mujeeb Ijaz, Indrajeet Thorat, Depeng Wang.(Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mujeeb Ijaz Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Josh Hood Declaration
19 19 motion Transfer Case Wed 03/11 5:58 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case by Apple Inc., Michael Erickson, Mujeeb Ijaz, Indrajeet Thorat, Depeng Wang.(Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
18 18 respm Opposition to Motion Wed 03/11 5:57 PM
Opposition re6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Apple Inc., Michael Erickson, Mujeeb Ijaz, Indrajeet Thorat, Depeng Wang.(Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mujeeb Ijaz Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Donald Dafoe Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Johnson Controls Opposition,
Att: 4 Exhibit D Johnson Controls Decision
Tuesday, March 10, 2015
17 17 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 03/10 6:06 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Apple Inc., Michael Erickson, Mujeeb Ijaz, Indrajeet Thorat, Depeng Wang. (Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 03/10 6:04 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Apple Inc., Michael Erickson, Mujeeb Ijaz, Indrajeet Thorat, Depeng Wang.(Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Tue 03/10 10:22 AM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Robert s. Gilmore for A123 Systems LLC; granting14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Added Robert J. Bowes for A123 Systems LLC. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 06, 2015
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/06 2:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Bowes Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5442829 by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/06 2:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Robert Gilmore Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-5442800 by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
12 12 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Fri 03/06 9:52 AM
STATE COURT Record. (Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 05, 2015
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/05 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Mankes on behalf of Apple Inc., Michael Erickson, Mujeeb Ijaz, Indrajeet Thorat, Depeng Wang (Mankes, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 03, 2015
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/03 5:02 PM
Judge Douglas P. Woodlock: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time Until 3/11/15 to File Response re6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction, and to Expedite Discovery . (Lovett, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/03 4:30 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 3/11/15 to File Response to Plaintiff's pending Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunctive Relief, and Expedited Discovery by Apple Inc., Michael Erickson, Mujeeb Ijaz, Indrajeet Thorat, Depeng Wang.(Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 18, 2015
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 02/18 4:29 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by A123 Systems Inc.. Acknowledgement filed by A123 Systems Inc.. (Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 02/18 4:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
6 6 motion Preliminary Injunction Expedite Temporary Restraining Order Wed 02/18 4:17 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION to Expedite Discovery , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by A123 Systems Inc..(Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/18 4:15 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by A123 Systems Inc.. (Kruzer, Lyndsey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 02/17 3:28 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Douglas P. Woodlock assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Abaid, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/17 3:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Apple Inc.. (Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Tue 02/17 3:18 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Geraldino-Karasek, Clarilde)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 02/17 3:11 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Apple Inc. ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5411237 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Melnick, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Part 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Part 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Part 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing to State Court,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet