Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Robert M Dow, Jr
Case #: 1:15-cv-01433
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 17, 2015
Last checked: Sunday Aug 16, 2015 8:36 AM CDT
Defendant
PAUL J CIOLINO
Defendant
Northwestern University
Represented By
Jory M Hoffman
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Gabriel A. Fuentes
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Terri Lynn Mascherin
Jenner & Block LLP
contact info
Defendant
DAVID PROTESS
Defendant
JACK P. RIMLAND
Defendant
Paul J. Ciolino
Represented By
Terence Edward Flynn
Law Office Of Terence E. Flynn
contact info
Thomas J. Fleischmann
Thomas J. Fleischmann & Associates
contact info
Defendant
David Protess
Represented By
Chirag Gopal Badlani
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, Ltd.
contact info
Matthew J. Piers
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Jack P. Rimland
Represented By
David M. Macksey
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info
Joseph R. Marconi
Johnson & Bell, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
ALSTORY SIMON
Represented By
James Gus Sotos
The Sotos Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Tracy L Stanker
Ekl, Williams & Provenzale LLC
contact info
Patrick L. Provenzale
Ekl, Williams & Provenzale LLC
contact info
Terry A. Ekl
Ekl, Williams & Provenzale LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Jordan Ann Erickson
The Sotos Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey Neil Given
The Sotos Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Alstory Simon
Represented By
Jordan Ann Lejcar
The Sotos Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
James Gus Sotos
The Sotos Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Tracy L Stanker
Ekl, Williams & Provenzale LLC
contact info
Patrick L. Provenzale
Ekl, Williams & Provenzale LLC
contact info
Terry A. Ekl
Ekl, Williams & Provenzale LLC
contact info
Andrew M. Hale
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Jeffrey Neil Given
The Sotos Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Avi T. Kamionski
Hale Law LLC
contact info
Shneur Z. Nathan
Hale Law LLC
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 3/29/2016. Mailed notice(cdh, )
GPO Apr 22 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 4/22/2016. Mailed notice(cdh, )
GPO Jan 03 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 1/3/2017. Mailed notice(cdh, )
GPO Jan 03 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. on 1/3/2017. Mailed notice(cdh, )
GPO Jan 06 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 1/6/2017. Mailed notice (ao,)
GPO Feb 03 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 2/3/2017. Mailed notice (ao,)
GPO Mar 31 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 3/31/2017. Mailed notice (ao,)
GPO May 04 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 5/4/2017. Mailed notice (ao,)
GPO May 05 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 5/5/2017. Mailed notice (ao,)
GPO Jun 20 2017
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 6/20/2017. Mailed notice (ao,)
GPO Nov 15 2018
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order: Signed by the Honorable M. David Weisman on 11/15/2018. Mailed notice (ao,)
Docket last updated: 02/18/2015 3:34 PM CST
Tuesday, February 17, 2015
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Geraldine Brown. (dc, )
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by ALSTORY SIMON; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-10349574.(Ekl, Terry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ALSTORY SIMON by Terry A. Ekl (Ekl, Terry)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ALSTORY SIMON by Patrick L. Provenzale (Provenzale, Patrick)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ALSTORY SIMON by Tracy L Stanker (Stanker, Tracy)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ALSTORY SIMON by James Gus Sotos (Sotos, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ALSTORY SIMON by Jordan Ann Erickson (Erickson, Jordan)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ALSTORY SIMON by Jeffrey Neil Given (Given, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff ALSTORY SIMON by Andrew M. Hale (Hale, Andrew)
Related: [-]