Missouri Western District Court
Judge:Stephen R Bough
Case #: 3:03-cv-05088
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2003
Terminated:Feb 23, 2006
Defendant
American General Finance, Inc.
Defendant
American General Financial Group
Defendant
American General Financial Service, Inc.
interested party
Great Southern Bank
Plaintiff
Rodney A. Hall

GPO Feb 16 2006
ORDER granting 42 motion to enforce judgment, affirming 7/14/2005 Award of Arbitrator and 8/5/2005 Clarification of Award; denying 40 41 appeals; denying 61 motion for leave to file additional reply brief, motion to compel; denying 64 motion to file brief under seal; lifting stay of Arbitrator's award. Signed by Judge William A. Knox on 2/16/2006. (Bode, Kay)


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.