California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephen L Johnson
Case #: 5:15-bk-50553
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Mar 25, 2015
Claims Deadline:Jun 23, 2015
Terminated:Jun 20, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
AQH, LLC
440 N Wolfe Rd # 243
Sunnyvale, CA 94085-3869
Represented By
Reno F.R. Fernandez
Macdonald Fernandez LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


1. Bitcoin Miner Aquifer Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (coindesk.com)
Submitted Tue 02/24/2015
Docket last updated: 5 minutes ago
Wednesday, March 08, 2017
243 243 order Compel Wed 03/08 4:11 PM
Judgment Related [+] (rdr)
Related: [-] 237