Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Harold L Murphy
Referred: Walter E Johnson
Case #: 4:15-cv-00032
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Feb 19, 2015
Terminated:Jun 01, 2015

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, July 26, 2016
30 30 appeal USCA Order Tue 07/26 3:14 PM
Certified copy of ORDER of USCA denying application for COA re:24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright is issued as the mandate of this Court. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-13177 A.(dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter
Wednesday, December 16, 2015
29 29 appeal USCA Order Thu 12/17 10:49 AM
Certified copy of ORDER of USCA dismissing appeal for want of prosecution is issued as the mandate of this court re:24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright,17 Notice of Appeal filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-14450 A. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 07, 2015
28 28 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Wed 10/07 4:37 PM
USCA Acknowledgment of24 Notice of Appeal, filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-14450 A. (dob)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Wed 10/07 4:39 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,24 Notice of Appeal,. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-14450 A. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2015
27 27 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 09/01 9:18 AM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Amended Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Orders, Report and Recommendation, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re24 Amended Notice of Appeal. (dob)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Filing Tue 09/01 9:14 AM
NOTICE Of Filing transmittal letter to USCA re24 Notice of Appeal. (dob)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Tue 09/01 9:19 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,24 Notice of Appeal,17 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-13177 A. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (dob)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2015
25 25 order Order Mon 08/31 2:05 PM
ORDER denying the portion of24 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright that the Court construes as a request for a certificate of appealability. The Court order Petition to, pay the $505.0 filing fee or submit a completed application for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis within 21 days. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 8/31/2015. (dob)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Mon 08/31 9:05 AM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,24 Amended Notice of Appeal,17 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-13177 A. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 08/31 2:06 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Nolan Cecil Boatright re25 Order with forms. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2015
24 24 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 08/31 9:04 AM
AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Order on Motion for New Trial,12 Clerk's Judgment,14 Order,23 Order,18 Order,,11 Order on Final Report and Recommendation by Nolan Cecil Boatright. Transcript Order Form due on 9/10/2015 (dob)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 31, 2015
appeal Transcript Order Form Fri 07/31 3:01 PM
TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (no form received) re17 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to 11TH CIRCUIT Case Number 15-13177 A. Certificate of Readiness due on 8/14/2015. (dob)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Fri 07/31 3:02 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,17 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-13177 A. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 30, 2015
23 23 order Order Thu 07/30 1:39 PM
ORDER directing Petitioner to either pay the $505.00 filing fee or submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis withing 21 dyas. The Court directs the Clerk to mail a copy of the in forma pauperis application to Petitioner. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 7/30/2015. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 07/30 1:57 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Nolan Cecil Boatright re23 Order with forms. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 29, 2015
22 22 misc Letter Wed 07/29 12:03 PM
Letter from Nolan Boatright. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 22, 2015
21 21 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Wed 07/22 1:37 PM
USCA Acknowledgment of17 Notice of Appeal filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright. Case Appealed to 11th Circuit Case Number 15-13177 A. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2015
20 20 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Tue 07/14 2:45 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re17 Notice of Appeal. (dob)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Filing Tue 07/14 2:42 PM
NOTICE Of Filing transmittal letter to USCA re17 Notice of Appeal. (dob)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Order Tue 07/14 2:34 PM
ORDER denies without prejudice the portion of17 Notice of Appeal filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright that the Court construes as a request for leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and denies the portion of the Noice of Appeal that the Court construes as a request for a certificate of appealability. The Court Order Plaintiff to with pary $505.00 or submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauper within 21 days after the date of this order. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 7/14/2015. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 07/14 2:35 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Nolan Cecil Boatright re18 Order with forms. (dob)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 13, 2015
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 07/13 2:14 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Order on Motion for New Trial,14 Order by Nolan Cecil Boatright. Transcript Order Form due on 7/27/2015 (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 07/13 2:14 PM
Submission of17 Notice of Appeal, submitted to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 17, 2015
16 16 order Order on Motion for New Trial Wed 06/17 1:41 PM
ORDER denying15 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/17/2015. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Wed 06/17 1:43 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Nolan Cecil Boatright re16 Order on Motion for New Trial. (dob)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 15, 2015
15 15 motion New Trial Mon 06/15 2:26 PM
MOTION for New Trial by Nolan Cecil Boatright. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 02, 2015
14 14 order Order Tue 06/02 1:44 PM
ORDER overruling13 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright and declining to modify June 1, 2015 order. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/2/2015. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Tue 06/02 1:46 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Nolan Cecil Boatright re14 Order. (dob)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 01, 2015
12 12 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 06/01 11:40 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered denying habeas corpus petition and dismissing action. (dob)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Final Report and Recommendation Mon 06/01 11:26 AM
ORDER adopting9 Final Report and Recommendation; denying petitioner's 2254 petition as amended and declines to issue a Certificate of Appealability. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 6/1/2015. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 06/01 11:41 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Mon 06/01 11:44 AM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Nolan Cecil Boatright re12 Clerk's Judgment,11 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 27, 2015
utility Submission to District Judge Wed 05/27 9:40 AM
Submission of9 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re8 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright, submitted to District Judge Harold L. Murphy. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 07, 2015
10 10 order Order for Service of Report and Recommendation Thu 05/07 12:06 PM
ORDER for Service of9 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/7/15. (klb)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Report and Recommendation - Final Thu 05/07 12:06 PM
ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - Commissioner Bryson's Motion to Intervene6 is GRANTED, and the undersigned RECOMMENDS that the Petition1 , as amended8 , be DENIED and that the Court DECLINE to issue a certificate of appealability. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/7/15. (klb)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Intervene Thu 05/07 12:02 PM
ORDER granting6 Commissioner Bryson's Motion to Intervene. (found in text of Order and Final Report & Recommendation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/7/15. (klb)
Related: [-]
utility Clerks Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/07 12:07 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Nolan Cecil Boatright re9 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and10 Order for Service of Order and Final Report and Recommendation. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 17, 2015
8 8 cmp Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 04/17 2:02 PM
AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright. Related document:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright.(dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 14, 2015
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 04/14 9:43 AM
Submission of6 MOTION to Intervene Corrections Commissioner Homer Bryson As Party Respondent , submitted to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 31, 2015
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 03/31 8:49 AM
Submission of2 Order to Show Cause, submitted to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Wed 03/25 2:24 PM
NOTICE Of Filing by Fred Head(Kolb, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 a copy of Petitioners state habeas corpus petition filed on August 13, 2012.,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2/Part 1 volume 1 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2/Part 2 volume 1 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2/Part 3 volume 1 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3 volume 2 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 6 Exhibit 4/Part 1 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 7 Exhibit 4/Part 2 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 8 Exhibit 4/Part 3 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 9 Exhibit 4/Part 4 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 10 Exhibit 4/Part 5 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 11 Exhibit 4/Part 6 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 12 Exhibit 4/Part 7 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 13 Exhibit 4/Part 8 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 14 Exhibit 4/Part 9 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 15 Exhibit 4/Part 10 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 16 Exhibit 4/Part 11 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 17 Exhibit 4/Part 12 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 18 Exhibit 4/Part 13 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 19 Exhibit 4/Part 14 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 20 Exhibit 4/Part 15 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 21 Exhibit 4/Part 16 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 22 Exhibit 4/Part 17 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 23 Exhibit 4/Part 18 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 24 Exhibit 4/Part 19 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 25 Exhibit 4/Part 20 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 26 Exhibit 4/Part 21 volume 3 of Petitioners March 4, 2013, habeas corpus transcript.,
Att: 27 Exhibit 5 a copy of the habeas courts order denying relief on July 8, 2014.,
Att: 28 Exhibit 6 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts order denying Petitioners application for a certificate of probable cause to appeal.
Monday, March 23, 2015
6 6 motion Intervene Mon 03/23 4:21 PM
MOTION to Intervene Corrections Commissioner Homer Bryson As Party Respondent with Brief In Support by Fred Head.(Kolb, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief In Support Of Motion Of Corrections Commissioner Homer Bryson To Intervene As Party Respondent
5 5 respm Response to Habeas Corpus Petition Mon 03/23 4:18 PM
RESPONSE to Habeas Corpus Petition re1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Fred Head.(Kolb, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief In Support Of Answer-Response
Monday, March 02, 2015
4 4 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Mon 03/02 2:38 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt as to Warden re2 Order to Show Cause. (dob)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certified Mail Returned Receipt Mon 03/02 2:36 PM
Certified Mail Returned Receipt as to Attorney General re2 Order to Show Cause. (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 24, 2015
2 2 order Order to Show Cause Tue 02/24 11:04 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - The Clerk SHALL transmit a copy of the Petition and this Order by certified mail to respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Georgia. Respondent shall SHOW CAUSE within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the receipt of this Order why the Petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 2/24/15. (klb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 20, 2015
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Fri 02/20 1:14 PM
Submission of1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, submitted to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 19, 2015
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Fri 02/20 1:10 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number GAN100071532.), filed by Nolan Cecil Boatright.(dob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,Address and Receipt