Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Christopher A Boyko
Case #: 1:15-cv-00343
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Feb 23, 2015
Terminated:Apr 23, 2015
Last checked: Saturday Aug 22, 2015 9:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Kong Company, The
Defendant
Kong Company
Represented By
Kenneth K. Suh
Foley & Lardner - Chicago
contact info
Jeanne Marie Gills
Foley & Lardner - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
OurPet's Company
Represented By
C. Vincent Choken
Choken & Welling
contact info
John D. Gugliotta
contact info
David A. Welling
Choken & Welling
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 22, 2015
12 12 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Fri 05/22 2:25 PM
Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (K,Ca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 23, 2015
11 11 order Order Dismissing Case Thu 04/23 12:12 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal without prejudice Related [+]. Plaintiff to bear costs. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/23/2015. (H,CM)
Related: [-] lated doc #10
Wednesday, April 22, 2015
10 10 notice Notice of Dismissal Wed 04/22 4:50 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) filed by OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 08, 2015
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 04/08 11:58 AM
Attorney Appearance by Kenneth K. Suh filed by on behalf of Kong Company. (Suh, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 25, 2015
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Wed 03/25 9:58 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's Motion for attorney Jeanne Marie Gills to appear pro hac vice Related [+]. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. The CM/ECF registration form can be found at www.ohnd.uscourts.gov under Forms. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/25/2015.(H,CM)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/24 3:37 PM
Motion for attorney Jeanne M. Gills to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-7015711, filed by Defendant Kong Company.(Lueder, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration o Jeanne M. Gills
Thursday, March 19, 2015
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 03/19 3:34 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's7 Motion for Extension of Time until 5/22/2015 to Answer. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 3/19/2015.(H,CM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2015
7 7 motion Extension (answer complaint) Wed 03/18 2:26 PM
Stipulated Motion for extension of time until 5/22/2015 to answer filed by Plaintiff OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 03/18 9:57 AM
First Amended complaint against Kong Company. Filed by OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 ('589 utility patent),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 (infringement chart),
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 ('529 utility patent)
Friday, March 13, 2015
5 5 service Return of Service Executed Fri 03/13 8:58 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Kong Company on 3/9/2015, filed on behalf of OurPet's Company, Related document(s)4 . (M,M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 24, 2015
oth_evt Service by Clerk Tue 02/24 2:07 PM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Kong Company, The placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 70140510000189485180. (C,KA)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 23, 2015
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Mon 02/23 10:34 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Kong Company, The. (C,BA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
3 3 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Mon 02/23 10:20 AM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/23 10:17 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Virtue Company for OurPet's Company filed by OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/23 10:16 AM
Complaint with jury demand for utility patent infringement against The Kong Company, LLC. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-6970102. Filed by OurPet's Company. (Welling, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 ('589 utility patent),
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (claims chart),
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 02/23 10:24 AM
Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (C,BA)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 02/23 10:24 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman. (C,BA)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Link to Local Patent Rules Mon 02/23 10:42 AM
This action has been identified as a Patent Case that is subject to the Local Patent Rules. Link to [LINK:Local Patent Rules] . (C,BA)
Related: [-]