Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Joan H Lefkow
Case #: 1:11-cv-06804
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2011
Terminated:Mar 13, 2013
Last checked: Monday Dec 26, 2016 8:29 PM CST
Counter Claimant
Analog Devices Inc.
Represented By
Colin G. Cabral
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Payal Salsburg
Proskauer Rose
contact info
Gourdin W. Sirles
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Steven M Bauer
Proskauer Rose, LLP
contact info
Amy Crafts
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Catherine J. Spector
contact info
John M. Kitchura, Jr.
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Sharada Devarasetty
Proskauer Rose, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Knowles Electronics, LLC
Represented By
Roderick Ratcliff Mckelvie
Covington & Burling
contact info
Brian Bieluch
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Allan J. Sternstein
Lathrop & Gage LLP
contact info
Keith Teel
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Timothy K. Sendek
Lathrop & Gage LLP
contact info
Richard L Rainey
General Electric Company (ct)
contact info
Michael N Kennedy
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Sturgis Martin Sobin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Eric Hellerman
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
David A. Garr
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Paul Joseph Wilson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Defendant
Analog Devices Inc.
Represented By
Bradley James Lorden
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Colin G. Cabral
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Payal Salsburg
Proskauer Rose
contact info
Amy Crafts
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Matthew J. Morris
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Sharada Devarasetty
Proskauer Rose, LLP
contact info
Brendan S. Cox
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Jared T Kelly
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Gourdin W. Sirles
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Safraz W. Ishmael
Proskauer Rose
contact info
Steven M Bauer
Proskauer Rose, LLP
contact info
Steven M. Kayman
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Catherine J. Spector
contact info
John M. Kitchura, Jr.
Proskauer Rose LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Knowles Electronics, LLC
Represented By
Roderick Ratcliff Mckelvie
Covington & Burling
contact info
Brian Bieluch
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Timothy K. Sendek
Lathrop & Gage LLP
contact info
Dale A. Rice
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Michael N Kennedy
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Sturgis Martin Sobin
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Paul Joseph Wilson
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Robert T Haslam
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Allan J. Sternstein
Lathrop & Gage LLP
contact info
Keith Teel
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
Richard L Rainey
General Electric Company (ct)
contact info
Eric Hellerman
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info
David A. Garr
Covington & Burling LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 23 2012
Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 4/23/2012:Mailed notice(mad, )
GPO Feb 19 2013
Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 2/19/2013:Mailed notice(mad, )
GPO Mar 07 2013
Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Joan H. Lefkow on 3/7/2013:Mailed notice(mad, )


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.