Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Bernard A Friedman
Referred: Mona K Majzoub
Case #: 4:15-cv-10702
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 25, 2015
Last checked: Monday Aug 24, 2015 8:53 AM EDT
Defendant
Boral Stone Products, LLC
Represented By
Daniel Francis Diffley
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Meredith Jones Kingsley
Alston And Bird LLP
contact info
Joanne G. Swanson
Kerr, Russell, (detroit)
contact info
Defendant
TotalStone, LLC
Represented By
Megan Odell
Simon, P.L.C.
contact info
Frank R. Simon
Simon, Galasso,
contact info
Marjan Neceski
Simon Plc, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info
Plaintiff
Stone Pro, LLC
Represented By
David W. Brauer
Zichi & Brauer, PC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Instone, LLC
Terminated: 04/29/2015
Represented By
Megan Odell
Simon, P.L.C.
contact info
Frank R. Simon
Simon, Galasso,
contact info
Marjan Neceski
Simon Plc, Attorneys & Counselors
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, February 26, 2015
4 4 order Show Cause Thu 02/26 1:22 PM
ORDER for Stone Pro, LLC to Show Cause Signed by District Judge Bernard A. Friedman. (MVer)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 25, 2015
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Wed 02/25 3:15 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Stone Pro, LLC (Brauer, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Jury Demand Wed 02/25 3:12 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Stone Pro, LLC (Brauer, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 02/25 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Stone Pro, LLC against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-5042477 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Livingston - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Brauer, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11