Alabama Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Tamara O Mitchell
Case #: 2:15-bk-00724
Case Filed:Feb 26, 2015
Terminated:May 18, 2016
Plan Confirmed:Mar 22, 2016

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $100,001 to $500,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Rostro, Inc.
Christian & Small LLP 1800 Financial Center 505 North 20th Street
Birmingham, AL 35203
Represented By
Bradley Richard Hightower
Christian & Small LLP
contact info
Daniel D Sparks
contact info

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.


Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago
Friday, May 20, 2016
187 187 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/21 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 185 Final Decree
186 186 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/21 12:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/20/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 184 Order on Motion for Final Decree
Wednesday, May 18, 2016
185 185 order Final Decree Wed 05/18 2:16 PM
Final Decree Signed on 5/18/2016. (klt)
Related: [-]
184 184 order Final Decree Wed 05/18 2:14 PM
Order Granting Motion For Final Decree Related [+] Signed on 5/18/2016. (klt)
Related: [-] 168
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 05/18 2:16 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (klt)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
183 183 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/14 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+]. Notice Date 05/13/2016. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 182 Order on Application for Compensation