Ouedraogo v. Bonkoungou et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Pauley, III |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01345 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 28:1367 Other Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 23, 2015 8:00 AM EDT |
Defendant
Leopold Bonkoungou
|
|
Defendant
Lucile Bonkoungou Ouedraogo
|
|
Plaintiff
Fatoumata Ouedraogo
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, September 30, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/30 10:00 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Leopold Bonkoungou, Lucile Bonkoungou Ouedraogo. Document filed by Fatoumata Ouedraogo. (Rose, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, September 29, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Tue 09/29 4:20 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rebecca Kahan Waldman dated September 29, 2015 re: Conference scheduled for October 2, 2015. Document filed by Fatoumata Ouedraogo.(Waldman, Rebecca) |
|
Monday, July 27, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 07/28 9:56 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:6 Letter re: Pre-Trial Conference on August 7, 2015, filed by Fatoumata Ouedraogo. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned and rescheduled for October 2, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 10/2/2015 at 10:30 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 7/27/2015) (kko) |
|
Thursday, July 23, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Thu 07/23 3:18 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rebecca K. Waldman dated July 23, 2015 re: Pre-Trial Conference on August 7, 2015. Document filed by Fatoumata Ouedraogo.(Waldman, Rebecca) |
|
Wednesday, May 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 05/06 6:17 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:4 Letter Pre-trial Conference for May 14, 2015, filed by Fatoumata Ouedraogo. ENDORSEMENT: The initial pre-trial conference is adjourned and rescheduled for August 7, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 8/7/2015 at 10:00 AM before Judge William H. Pauley III.) (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 5/6/2015) (spo) |
|
Wednesday, April 29, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Letter
Wed 04/29 4:56 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Rebecca Kahan Waldman dated April 29, 2015 re: Pre-trial Conference for May 14, 2015. Document filed by Fatoumata Ouedraogo.(Waldman, Rebecca) |
|
Monday, March 30, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order for Initial Pretrial Conference
Mon 03/30 8:48 AM
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/14/2015 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20B at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/30/2015) (mro) |
|
Tuesday, February 24, 2015 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 02/26 10:58 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (moh) (moh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 02/26 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Leopold Bonkoungou, Lucile Bonkoungou Ouedraogo. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401117819)Document filed by Fatoumata Ouedraogo.(moh) (moh) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/26 10:57 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leopold Bonkoungou, Lucile Bonkoungou Ouedraogo. (moh) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Thu 02/26 10:57 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (moh) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Thu 02/26 10:58 AM
Case Designated ECF. (moh) |