North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Frank D Whitney
Referred: David Keesler
Case #: 3:11-cv-00461
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Sep 16, 2011
Terminated:Sep 28, 2011
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 22, 2017 5:56 AM EST
Defendant
Bernard L. Smith, III
Defendant
David J. Smith
Defendant
Stealth Components, Inc.
Plaintiff
Joseph Drake
Represented By
Margaret Mary Manos
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Paul Obendorf
Represented By
Margaret Mary Manos
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/15/2011 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, September 16, 2011
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0419-1465310), filed by Joseph Drake, Paul Obendorf.(Kingston, Margaret)
Related: [-]