Rountree v. State of Georgia
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Harold L Murphy |
Referred: | Walter E Johnson |
Case #: | 4:15-cv-00043 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 27, 2015 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2015 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 01, 2015 | ||
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Wed 04/01 8:35 AM
Case transferred electronically to District of USDC MD GA. (dob) |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Wed 04/01 8:37 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (dob) |
||
utility
Remark
Wed 04/01 10:15 AM
acknowledged receipt of electronically transferred case by USDC MD GA, their civil action no. 5:15-cv-118. (dob) |
||
Monday, March 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order
Mon 03/16 2:25 PM
ORDER transferring this action to the District Court for the Middle District of Georgia, Macon Division, for further proceedings if there is no objections filed within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Should objections be filed, the Clerk should await a further Order form the District Court. The Clerk is directed to terminate the referral to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/2015. (dob) |
|
utility
Clerks Certificate of Mailing
Mon 03/16 2:26 PM
Clerks Certificate of Mailing as to Larry Archie Roundtree re4 Order. (dob) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Mon 03/16 2:27 PM
Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated. (dob) |
||
Friday, March 06, 2015 | ||
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Fri 03/06 2:41 PM
Submission of2 (Original) Complaint,3 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (bjh) |
||
Monday, March 02, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account
Fri 03/06 2:40 PM
Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by Larry Archie Rountree; unsigned by an Authorized Officer. (bjh) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Fri 03/06 2:39 PM
(Original) COMPLAINT filed by Larry Archie Rountree. (Attachment: #1 Envelope)(bjh) |
|
utility
Submission to Magistrate Judge
Mon 03/02 3:18 PM
Submission of1 Complaint, submitted to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (dob) |
||
Friday, February 27, 2015 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 03/02 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT, filed by Larry Archie Rountree.(dob) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 3/2/2015 (dob) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Address |