Consolidated
Lead case: 1:14-md-02543

New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Referred: James L Cott
Case #: 1:15-cv-01514
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332mv Diversity-Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 02, 2015
Terminated:May 22, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 01, 2020 3:31 PM EDT
Defendant
General Motors Holding, L.L.C.
Defendant
General Motors L.L.C.
Plaintiff
Lacey Ditcharo
Represented By
Daniel E. Becnel, Jr.
Becnel Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Salvadore Christina, Jr.
Becnel Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALL PLAINTIFFS
Represented By
Brett A. Emison
Langdon & Emison
contact info
Respondent
King & Spalding LLP
Represented By
Tai Hyun Park
Park Jensen Bennett LLP
contact info
Tami Scarola Stark
Park Jensen Bennett LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
ADR Provider
Brenda Gregory
Terminated: 04/30/2018
Plaintiff
Berenice Summerville
Terminated: 01/17/2017
Plaintiff
Jennifer Lankford
Terminated: 04/30/2018


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, February 17, 2022
223 223 order Protective Order Thu 02/17 2:15 PM
ORDER [Amending the Restrictions on Use of Confidential and Highly Confidential Information]. Defendants and Lead Counsel for plaintiffs having consented thereto, and for good cause shown, Order No. 10 Paragraph 7(a) (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No.2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italics) and as further set forth in this Order. In addition, Order No. 10 Paragraph 8 (Docket No. 294), as amended by Order No. 103 (Docket No. 2901), is further amended to state as follows (changes in italic) and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/17/22) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al. (yv)
Related: [-]