Lee v. Colvin
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Katherine Polk Failla |
Case #: | 1:15-cv-01472 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices) |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 03, 2015 9:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
Carolyn Colvin
|
|
Plaintiff
Danny Lee
89 Mulberry St. Apt. 4
New York, NY 10013 |
Docket last updated: 04/29/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
137 | 137
misc
Internet Citation
Wed 12/15 4:28 PM
INTERNET CITATION NOTE: Material from decision with Internet citation re:131 Memorandum & Opinion. (sjo) |