Zang v. Umami Sustainable Seafood, Inc.
California Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Anthony J Battaglia |
Referred: | David H Bartick |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00475 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 03, 2015 |
Terminated: | Feb 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Aug 30, 2015 6:17 AM PDT |
Defendant
Umami Sustainable Seafood, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Zang
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, November 01, 2018 | ||
58 | 58
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 11/01 1:42 PM
MANDATE of USCA affirming the decision of the USDC as to53 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Daniel Zang. (akr) |