Children of America, Inc.
Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Erik P Kimball |
Case #: | 9:15-bk-13997 |
Case Filed: | Mar 04, 2015 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Aug 01, 2015 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Children of America, Inc.
5300 W Atlantic Ave Ste 700
Delray Beach, FL 33484-8833 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130 |
1. | National childcare provider Children of America files Chapter 11 - South Florida Business Journal (bizjournals.com) |
Submitted Mon 03/16/2015 | |
Docket last updated: 16 seconds ago |
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
495 | 495
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Mon 08/27 10:06 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Adam, Lorraine) |