Tennessee Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shelley D Rucker
Case #: 1:15-bk-10870
Case Filed:Mar 04, 2015
Creditor Meeting:Sep 23, 2015
Converted:Aug 20, 2015
Terminated:Nov 22, 2017
Discharge Objection Deadline:Nov 23, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc.
1198 Shattuck Industrial Blvd
La Fayette, GA 30728-3736
Represented By
Jerrold D. Farinash
Farinash & Hayduk
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Astralloy Steel Products, Inc.
Committee Member: Evonne Ditri Regional Credit Specialist 8 Woodhollow Road, Suite 102
Parsippany, NJ 07054
Creditor Committee
Industrial Welding Supply Co., Inc.
Committee Member: Robert (Alex) Emerson President P.O. Box 4014
Chattanooga, TN 37405
Creditor Committee
Joseph T. Ryerson & Son, Inc.
Committee Member: Kenny Wine Regional Credit Manager 7701 Lindsey Road
Little Rock, AR 72206
Represented By
Lynnette R. Warman
Culhane, Meadows, PLLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Kleen-A-Matic
Committee Member: Greg Goodgame 103 W. Lake Avenue
Rossville, GA 30741
Creditor Committee
Stateline Fasteners, LLC
Committee Member: Harold Downs President 70 Warehouse Way
Rossville, GA 30741
Creditor Committee
The Heil Company
Committee Member: George J. Paturalski Director, Risk Management 2030 Hamilton Place Blvd. #200
Chattanooga, TN 37921
Creditor Committee
The Tool Crib, Inc.
Committee Member: Frank Slagle President P.O. Box 52810
Knoxville, TN 37950
Trustee
Richard P. Jahn, Jr.
Suite 160 1200 Mountain Creek Road
Chattanooga, TN 37405
Trustee
Douglas R. Johnson
Johnson & Mulroony, PC P. O. Box 2188
Chattanooga, TN 37409
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Historic U.S. Courthouse 31 E. Eleventh Street Fourth Floor
Chattanooga, TN 37402
Represented By
Kimberly C. Swafford
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


1. Local factory files for bankruptcy (timesfreepress.com)
Submitted Tue 03/10/2015
Docket last updated: 03/03/2015 7:00 PM EST
Wednesday, March 04, 2015
1 1 67 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 03/04 11:17 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1717 Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc.. Incomplete Filings due by 03/18/2015. Chapter 11 Plan due by 07/2/2015. Disclosure Statement due by 07/2/2015. Government Proof of Claim due by 8/31/2015. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 03/04 11:18 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(1:15-bk-10870) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 13714987. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Wed 03/04 11:21 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc.. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Case Reassigned Wed 03/04 11:24 AM
Judge Shelley D. Rucker added to case. Involvement of Judge John C. Cook Terminated (bgs)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Wed 03/04 11:27 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc.. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Exhibit Wed 03/04 11:29 AM
Exhibit Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. Related [+]. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
7 7 motion Employ Wed 03/04 1:28 PM
Application to Employ Jerrold D. Farinash and Farinash & Hayduk as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. Hearing scheduled 3/9/2015 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
8 8 misc Declaration Wed 03/04 1:29 PM
Declaration Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. Related [+]. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ
9 9 motion Continuation of Utility Service Wed 03/04 1:36 PM
Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. Hearing to be held on 3/9/2015 at 01:30 PM Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Miscellaneous Motion Wed 03/04 1:45 PM
Miscellaneous Motion Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Salaries and Other Employee Obligations Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. Hearing scheduled 3/9/2015 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Phillips
11 11 motion Emergency/Expedited Hearing Wed 03/04 1:48 PM
Motion for Emergency/Expedited Hearing Related [+] Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ,9 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service,10 Miscellaneous Motion
Att: 1 Proposed Order
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/04 2:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Bruce C. Bailey on behalf of Creditor Cornerstone Community Bank. (Bailey, Bruce)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 03/04 2:04 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeffrey W. Maddux on behalf of Creditor Cornerstone Community Bank. (Maddux, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/04 3:12 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. Related [+]. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-] 7 Application to Employ,8 Declaration,9 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service,10 Miscellaneous Motion,11 Motion for Emergency/Expedited Hearing
15 15 motion Use Cash Collateral Wed 03/04 5:56 PM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Jerrold D. Farinash on behalf of Debtor Phillips Brothers Machine Co., Inc. Hearing scheduled 3/9/2015 at 01:30 PM at Courtroom A, Chattanooga, TN. (Farinash, Jerrold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order