Connecticut Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Julie A Manning
Case #: 3:08-bk-30377
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2008
Creditor Meeting:Apr 03, 2008
Claims Deadline:Jun 09, 2008
Terminated:Jul 15, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Jul 02, 2009

Debtor
The Standard Beef Company
216 Food Terminal Plaza
New Haven, CT 06532
Represented By
Timothy D. Miltenberger
Coan Lewendon Gulliver & Miltenberger
contact info
Ilan Markus
Leclairryan A Professional Corporation
contact info
Carl T. Gulliver
Coan Lewendon Gulliver & Miltenberger Ll
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C. One State Street, Suite 2400 P.O. Box 231277
Hartford, CT 06123
Represented By
Paul N. Gilmore
Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.
contact info
Evan S. Goldstein
Updike Kelly & Spellacy PC
contact info
Creditor Committee
Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.
Paul N. Gilmore Updike Kelly & Spellacy One State Street
Hartford, CT 06123
Represented By
Paul N. Gilmore
Updike, Kelly & Spellacy, P.C.
contact info
Kevin J. McEleney
Updike Kelly & Spellacy PC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U. S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee Giaimo Federal Building 150 Court Street, Room 302
New Haven, CT 06510
Represented By
Holley L. Claiborn
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info

GPO May 23 2011
Memorandum of Decision and Order Re: Partial Decision on Motion to Compel Turnover of "Carved Out" funds and Scheduling Status Conference Signed on 5/23/2011 (RE: 461 Motion to Compel filed by Debtor The Standard Beef Company, 468 Objection filed by Creditor West-Conn Meat Co., inc.) (DeMagistris, Francine)
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, July 15, 2015
court Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 07/15 8:56 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (Esposito, Pamela)
Related: [-]