Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Referred: Mary Pat Thynge
Case #: 1:11-cv-00908
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2011
Re-opened:Dec 18, 2017
Terminated:Jan 26, 2018
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2014 3:30 PM EST
Counter Claimant
Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By
Ian N. Feinberg
contact info
David L. Alberti
contact info
Marc C. Belloli
contact info
Margaret Elizabeth Day
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Farnan LLP
contact info
Yakov Zolotorev
contact info
Sal Lim
contact info
Clayton Thompson
contact info
Counter Defendant
Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Farnan LLP
contact info
Defendant
Motorola Mobility LLC
Represented By
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Jon R. Pierce
contact info
Alton L. Absher
contact info
Candice C. Decaire
contact info
D. Clay Holloway
contact info
William H. Boice
contact info
Steven D. Moore
contact info
Plaintiff
Intellectual Ventures I LLC
Represented By
Ian N. Feinberg
contact info
David L. Alberti
contact info
Marc C. Belloli
contact info
Margaret Elizabeth Day
contact info
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Farnan LLP
contact info
Yakov Zolotorev
contact info
James Hall
contact info
Peter Mikhail
contact info
Sal Lim
contact info
Nickolas J. Bohl
contact info
Clayton Thompson
contact info
Plaintiff
Intellectual Ventures II LLC
Represented By
Brian E. Farnan
Farnan LLP
contact info
Rosemary Jean Piergiovanni
Farnan LLP
contact info

GPO Jan 02 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 1/2/2014. (nmfn)
GPO Oct 28 2014
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 10/28/2014. (nmfn)
GPO Feb 24 2015
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 2/24/2015. (nmfn)
GPO Mar 31 2016
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Sue L. Robinson on 3/31/2016. (nmfn)
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, January 17, 2019
527 527 misc Acknowledgment of Receipt Thu 01/17 3:29 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT of 215 Multi Media Document. (rwc)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
526 526 misc Letter Fri 01/11 1:40 PM
Letter to Brian E. Farnan, Esq., from Clerk, dated 1/11/19, regarding return of Multi Media Document (D.I. 215 ). (rwc) Modified on 1/11/2019 (nms)
Related: [-]