New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa Margaret Smith
Case #: 7:08-cv-06446
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 18, 2008
Terminated:Aug 02, 2013
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 23, 2024 3:12 PM EDT
Defendant
M.D. Andrew Francis
Represented By
Michael T. Colavecchio
Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, L.L.P.(nyc)
contact info
Defendant
Jane Doe, L.C.S.W.
Defendant
M.D. Steve J. Kuruvilla
Represented By
Alisa R. Lebensohn
New York State Office Of The Attorney General (nyc)
contact info
Bridget Elizabeth Farrell
Attorney General Of The State Of New York
contact info
Ross Neil Herman
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
R.N. Edmund Murphy
Represented By
Alisa R. Lebensohn
New York State Office Of The Attorney General (nyc)
contact info
Bridget Elizabeth Farrell
Attorney General Of The State Of New York
contact info
Ross Neil Herman
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Stony Brook Psychiatric Assoc.
Represented By
Michael T. Colavecchio
Lewis Johs Avallone Aviles, L.L.P.(nyc)
contact info
Plaintiff
Masood Hyder
Represented By
Joseph Lanni
Law Office Of Joseph P. Lanni, P.C.,
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, August 02, 2013
38 38 1 pgs ORDER: ORDERED, that the action be and hereby is discontinued, without costs to any party, subject to reopening should the settlement not be concluded within sixty (60) days of the date hereof. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 8/2/2013) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Settlement Conference held on 7/26/2013. Joseph Lanni appearing in person for plaintiff, Ross Herman and Michael Colavecchio appearing in person for defendants. The matter is adjourned without date. (Court Reporter courtflow) (Plant, Miles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 6/20/2013, Joseph Lanni appearing by telephone for plaintiff, Ross Herman and Michael Colevecchio appearing by telephone for defendants (conference call). The matter is adjourned to 7/26/13 at 2:00 P.M. for an in-person settlement conference ( Settlement Conference set for 7/26/2013 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 520, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.). (Plant, Miles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2013
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 6/4/2013, Joseph Lanni appearing by telephone for plaintiff, Ross Herman and Michael Colevecchio appearing by telephone for defendants. Trial set to begin on 9/23/13 at 10:00 A.M. The matter is adjourned to 6/20/13 at 9:30 A.M. for a telephonic status conference ( Status Conference set for 6/20/2013 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.). (Court Reporter courtflow) (Plant, Miles)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2013
37 37 Letter addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Michael T. Colavecchio dated 5/17/2013 re: Please find enclosed the "Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge" executed by all counsel. Document filed by Andrew Francis, Stony Brook Psychiatric Assoc. (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2013
35 35 NOTICE of Notice, Consent, and Referenced of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. Document filed by Andrew Francis. (Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2013
36 36 JOINT CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDER: Counsel for all parties consent to a trial before a magistrate judge. As set forth in this Order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 5/16/2013) (mml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2013
34 34 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to this action to conduct trial proceedings before the designated magistrate judge. The parties consented to a trial by magistrate judge in their joint pre-trial submissions dated April 12, 2013. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 4/25/2013) (rsh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2013
33 33 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ross Neil Herman on behalf of Steve J. Kuruvilla, Edmund Murphy (Herman, Ross)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2013
32 32 ORDER: This case commenced on July 17, 2008, nearly five years ago. Since March 2011, I have granted seven requests for 90 day extensions to file a joint pretrial order and pretrial documentary submissions. The parties are hereby on notice that this is the last extension they will receive. Should the pretrial order and attendant documents not be filed on or before April 15, 2013, an order will be entered dismissing the action as abandoned. Pretrial Order due by 4/15/2013. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 3/26/2013) (ft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 03, 2012
31 31 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kevin T. Duffy from Joseph Lanni dated 3/15/2012 re: The parties jointly request an extension of approximately ninety (90) days for the completion of discovery, and approximately ninety (90) days for submission of a joint pretrial order in this matter, and as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (All Discovery due by 6/15/2012. Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2012.) (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 4/3/2012) (rjm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2010
30 30 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Joseph Lanni on behalf of Masood Hyder. New Address: JOSEPH LANNI The Jacob D. Fuchsberg Law Firm, 500 Fifth Ave 45th Fl, New York, NY, United States 10110, 212-869-3500. (Lanni, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 18, 2010
29 29 ORDER: After a status conference held on October 13, 2010, the parties are hereby ordered to complete discovery and file Pretrial Orders and Requests to Charge no later than March 15, 2011. (Signed by Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy on 10/13/10) (laq)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 17, 2010
28 28 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. Judge Stephen C. Robinson is no longer assigned to the case. (fk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 01, 2010
27 27 NOTICE All appearances scheduled in cases on the docket of Judge Stephen C. Robinson are adjourned pending reassignment. Parties of record will be notified of the case reassignment via ECF email notification (or by written correspondence from the Clerk of Court). In all cases, counsel are reminded that a magistrate judge has been designated and are urged to consider consenting to trial before a White Plains magistrate judge under 28 U.S.C. 636. Inquiries may be directed to Robert Rogers, Deputy-in-Charge at 914-390-04001. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 08/26/2010) (mj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 29, 2010
26 26 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Hon. Stephen C. Robinson from Alisa R. Lebensolin dated 6/22/2010 re: Accordingly, I respectfully must request a diffrent date for the compliance conference...... ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. New conference date is Nov. 18th at 3:30pm.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 6/29/2010) (jma)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings: Pretrial Conference set for 11/18/2010 at 03:30 PM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (jma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 22, 2010
25 25 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Alisa R. Lebensohn dated 6/14/2010 re:...I am writing to request an adjournment of the upcoming June 30 conference, scheduled for 3:30pm... ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. New conference date is July 15th at 3:30pm. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 6/22/2010) (rj)
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Hearings: Conference set for 7/15/2010 at 03:30 PM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 28, 2010
24 24 RESCHEDULING NOTICE:The matter of Masood Hyde v. Steve J. Kuruvilla, MD has been rescheduled for a case management conference before the Hon. Stephen C. Robinson, United States District Judge, from June 10th, 2010 to June 30th,2010 @ 3:30pm in Courtroom 621,6th Floor. Case Management Conference set for 6/30/2010 at 03:30 PM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (rj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 12, 2010
23 23 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on January 27, 2010 before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. Court Reporter: Guido Tascione. (br)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 31, 2009
22 22 ORDER granting21 Motion for Alisa R. Lebensohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 8/31/2009) (mml)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 28, 2009
CASHIERS OFFICE REMARK on21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in the amount of $25.00, paid on 08/24/2009, Receipt Number 697988. (jd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 27, 2009
21 21 MOTION for Alisa R. Lebensohn to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. Document filed by Steve J. Kuruvilla, Edmund Murphy.(jma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 21, 2009
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stephen C. Robinson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/21/2009. Next PTC set for 6/10/2010 at 10:00 AM. (Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson). (Melendez, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2009
20 20 RESCHEDULING NOTICE: Case Management Conference set for 3/25/09 has been rescheduled to 4/21/2009 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 621, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (fk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 02, 2008
19 19 RESCHEDULING NOTICE: Case Management Conference set for 3/25/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. The matter of Masood Hyde v. Steve J. Kuruvilla, MD has been re-scheduled for a case management conference before the Hon. Stephen C. Robinson, United States District Judge, from December 5,2008 at 10:00am, to March 25,2009 at 10:00am in Courtroom 621, 6th Floor.(rj)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 10, 2008
18 18 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/1/2008. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2008. Deposition due by 10/30/2009. Discovery due by 6/1/2010. Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 11/06/2008) (gco)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 29, 2008
17 17 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Affidavit of Service served on Joseph Lanni, P.C., Andrew Francis M.D., Stony Brook Psychiatric Assoc. and Jane Doe, L.C.S.W. on September 29, 2008. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Edmund Murphy. (Farrell, Bridget)
Related: [-]
16 16 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Edmund Murphy.(Farrell, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 15, 2008
15 15 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Hon. Stephen C. Robinson from Bridget E. Farrell dated 09/11/2008 re: scheduling order. ENDORSEMENT: The scheduling order must be submitted by October 31, 2008.., Edmund Murphy answer due 9/30/2008. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 09/12/2008) (gco)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 12, 2008
14 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Steve J. Kuruvilla served on 8/8/2008, answer due 8/28/2008. Service was accepted by Sharon Rosseland, Dept of Psy Clerk, Stony Brook Univ. Hosp. & also accepted Affs of Svc for dfts Francis, SBPA & "Doe, LCSW".. Document filed by Masood Hyder.(Lanni, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Affidavits of Service
Wednesday, August 27, 2008
13 13 REQUEST for Production of Documents.Document filed by Andrew Francis.(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 REQUEST for Production of Documents.Document filed by Andrew Francis.(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE of To Maintain and Preserve. Document filed by Andrew Francis. (Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 REQUEST for Production of Documents.Document filed by Andrew Francis.(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Plaintiff as a party to the action and all distributees of the plaintiff's decedent who are making a claim for damages in this action on November 18, 2008 at 10:00 am.Document filed by Andrew Francis.(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
8 8 FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES to Plaintiff.Document filed by Andrew Francis.(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
7 7 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Stony Brook Psychiatric Assoc..(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Francis.(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Stony Brook Psychiatric Assoc..(Colavecchio, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of verified answer on 8/27/08. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Steve J. Kuruvilla. (Farrell, Bridget)
Related: [-]
3 3 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Steve J. Kuruvilla.(Farrell, Bridget)
Related: [-]
2 2 ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Dear Judge Robinson from Joseph Lanni dated 08/19/2008 re:.......requested that the Court direct the parties to submit a scheduling order on or before Sept. 30, 2008..... ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 8/26/2008) (jma)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 18, 2008
1 1 COMPLAINT against Steve J. Kuruvilla, Andrew Francis, Stony Brook Psychiatric Assoc., Edmund Murphy, Jane Doe, L.C.S.W.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 651476)Document filed by Masood Hyder.(jma)
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Steve J. Kuruvilla, Andrew Francis, Stony Brook Psychiatric Assoc., Edmund Murphy, Jane Doe, L.C.S.W.. (jma)
Related: [-]
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. (jma)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF. (jma)
Related: [-]