SIGHTSOUND TECHNOLOGIES LLC v. APPLE, INC.
Pennsylvania Western District Court | |
Judge: | Donetta W Ambrose |
Case #: | 2:11-cv-01292 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 28:1338 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Oct 10, 2011 |
Re-opened: | Feb 28, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 14, 2015 11:45 PM EDT |
Counter Claimant
APPLE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
SIGHTSOUND TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
APPLE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SIGHTSOUND TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
GREGORY BRADLEY
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
DAVID R. COHEN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
255 | 255
misc
Costs Taxed
Fri 07/21 2:20 PM
Costs Taxed in amount of $1,760.04 against SIGHTSOUND TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and in favor of APPLE, INC. (ept) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
254 | 254
notice
Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents
Wed 07/19 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Presentation and Attachment of Invoices in Connection with Pending Bill of Costs by APPLE, INC. re247 Bill of Costs (Batchelder, James) |
|
Att: 1 Itemized Costs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C |