California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Referred: Edmund F Brennan
Case #: 2:10-cv-01273
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause31:3729 False Claims Act
Case Filed:May 24, 2010
Terminated:May 29, 2014
Last checked: Monday Mar 16, 2015 4:55 AM PDT
Defendant
Casear Fonte
Defendant
Western Medical, Inc.
Represented By
Stephanie Albrecht
Orrick Herrington And Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
McGregor Scott
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert C. Wesley
Defendant
William H. Resh
Defendant
Nevada Heart and Vascular Center, LLP
Defendant
Monty C. Morales
Defendant
Arjun V. Gururaj
Defendant
W. Judson Fisher
Defendant
Leon Feldman
Defendant
Peter Elia
Defendant
Biotronik, Inc.
Represented By
Christopher A. Myers, PHV
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Vince Lee Farhat
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
John S. Irving, PHV
Holland & Knight, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Robert N. Berkley
Intervenor Plaintiff
State of California
Represented By
Erika Hiramatsu
California Dept. Of Justice
contact info
David B. Zlotnick
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Nicholas N. Paul
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Emmanuel Ramon Salazar
Office Of The Attorney General
contact info
Intervenor Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kelli L. Taylor, GOVT
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Catherine J. Swann
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Adam J. Schwartz
contact info
Plaintiff
Max Bennett
Represented By
Claire M Sylvia
Phillips & Cohen LLP
contact info
L Timothy Terry, PHV
The Terry Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info
Timothy C Bennett, PHV
Timothy Bennett, P.C.
contact info
Peter Chatfield, PHV
Phillips And Cohen LLP
contact info

GPO May 19 2010
ORDER signed by Judge Larry R Hicks on 5/19/2010 GRANTING 4 Motion to Change Venue. [Transferred from nvd on 5/24/2010] (Donati, J)
GPO Jul 02 2010
ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 7/2/10 GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension. United States and State of California has up to and including 10/9/2010 to make a decision whether to intervene in this action. This order is deemed filed nunc pro tunc as of 5/19/2010. (Donati, J)
GPO Jan 13 2011
ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 1/12/2011 GRANTING government's 22 Ex Parte Motion to partially lift seal. At the discretion of the United States, the government may disclose allegations raised by Relator and/or provide a copy of 1 Complaint and any Amended Complaints subsequently filed to: (1) defendant Biotronik Inc.; (2) defendant Western Medical Inc.; and (3) the arbitrator presiding over an employment dispute between Relator and Biotronik Inc.. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the US shall advise arbitrator presiding over an employment dispute between Relator and Biotronik Inc., of the sealed nature of proceeding and that its existence not be further disseminated; and the 1 Complaint and all other filings remain UNDER SEAL, except insofar as seal has been partially lifted by Court. (cc: Judge Damrell and US Attorney's Office) (Marciel, M) Modified on 1/13/2011 (Marciel, M).
GPO Mar 24 2011
e in this action; and the status (pretrial scheduling) conf shall be set thereafter. The complaint and all other filings shall remain under SEAL until the US notices its elections, or until further order of this Court. (Kastilahn, A)ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/23/11, re: 25 US' Request and 27 Proposed Order. The US and plaintiff shall have through and including 9/23/11, to notify the Court of their respective decisions on whether to interven
GPO May 10 2011
ORDER granting 30 Motion to file Amended Complaint signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/10/2011. Clerk is directed to file and docket Exhibit A to 30 Motion UNDER SEAL. All filings in this matter shall remain UNDER SEAL until further order of this court. (Waggoner, D)
GPO Oct 14 2011
ORDER re: the United States' 35 ex parte application for an extension to decide whether to intervene and extension of the seal period, signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/13/11. The United States and plaintiff states shall have until 3/23/12 to notify the Court of their decisions on whether to intervene in this action. This case shall remain SEALED until the United States notices its elections, or further order of this Court. The status (pretrial scheduling) conference shall be set for a time after the United States and plaintiff states notify the Court of their decisions on whether to intervene in this action. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO Dec 20 2011
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/19/11 GRANTING 38 Motion to Amend the Complaint. Clerk is directed to file and docket Attachment 1 to 38 Motion UNDER SEAL. All filings in this matter shall remain UNDER SEAL until further order of this court. (Meuleman, A)
GPO Mar 29 2012
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/28/2012 GRANTING government's 42 Motion for Extension of Time. They shall have through and including 7/24/2012 to notify Court of their respective decisions on whether to intervene in this action. The Complaint and all other filings shall remain UNDER SEAL until United States notices its election or until further Order of Court. (Marciel, M)
GPO Jan 29 2013
fully. (Reader, L)ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/28/2013 ORDERING 49 The US and plaintiff shall have through and including 7/24/2013, to notify the Court of their respective decisions on whether to intervene in this action; the complaint and all other filings shall remain UNDER SEAL until the US notices its election, or until further order of this Court; and the status (pretrial scheduling) conference shall be set for a time after the US and plaintiff states notify the Court of their respective decisions on whether to intervene in this action. In the event the US and plaintiff states seek further extension of the seal period, they shall submit a more detailed justification than provided to date, which the court will scrutinize care
GPO Aug 16 2013
R)ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/15/13 ORDERING On 7/23/13, the United States made its eighth ex parte request under the False Claims Act, 31 U.S.C. § 3730(b)(3), to extend the time by six months for the United States and plaintiff states to inform the court whether they will intervene in this qui tam lawsuit. Neither Relator nor defendant Biotronik, Inc. objects to the proposed six month extension of time. On 1/24/13, the court granted the United States' seventh ex parte request for an extension of the seal period, but advised that any further request by plaintiffs for an extension should be accompanied by "a more detailed justification than provided to date, which the court will scrutinize carefully." (ECF 50 (citing U.S. ex. rel. Costa v. Baker & Taylor, Inc., 955 F. Supp. 1188, 1190-91 (N.D. Cal. 1997).) While the current request's additional justification is scant, the court finds it is sufficient to grant the request given the new information referenced in paragraphs 6 through 8 of the Schwartz declaration. Any future request will be held more strictly to the detailed justification standard the court previously had articulated. Plaintiffs' request is granted.(Becknal,
GPO Feb 27 2014
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/27/14 ORDERING that before the court makes its tentative decision final, the United States will be provided an opportunity to supplement its showing. No later than seven days from the date of this order, counsel for the United States may file a supplemental declaration that includes actual dates on which critical events have occurred, to clarify adverbs such as recently (Decl. of Adam Schwartz 7, ECF 54-1) or generalized statements that the government has taken deposition testimony from two individuals (id. 8). A supplemental declaration also may detail what prejudice will result if the request to continue sealing is denied, and explain why the United States needs to give defendants a further opportunity to respond to the allegations against them so that it can decide whether to intervene. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO May 29 2014
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/29/14: The Complaint and Amended Complaints in this action are dismissed without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
GPO Jun 06 2014
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/6/2014 ORDERING all documents and docket entries in this action shall immediately be SEALED to allowthe parties an opportunity to submit pleadings on whether that seal should be lifted; The Complaint shall remain under seal until the Court has ruled on the motions by the Defendants; Defendants shall file under seal any appropriate motion papers within seven days after the Courts approval of this Stipulation; and The United States shall file any opposition within seven days after filing of the moving papers. Any motions and oppositions shall be heard at a hearing in this matter on July 11, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3 (KJM) on the 15th Floor.(Waggoner, D)
GPO Aug 20 2014
ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/19/14 ORDERING that Biotronik's MOTION to seal the complaint, 76, is DENIED, but the court GRANTES its Request to redact the payment figures in paragraphs 96, 86, 88, 78, 79 and 81 as well as the bullet points in paragraphs 78 and 79; The government's Request to maintain its extension requests under seal is DENIED, but the court GRANTES its request to redact paragraph 4 iii of the Supplemental Declaration, 57 filed 3/6/14; Relator is directed to work with Biotronik to file a redacted complaint within fourteen days of the date of this order; The government is directed to file its redacted Supplemental Declaration within fourteen days of the date of this order; Upon the filing of the redacted documents, this case will be UNSEALED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
GPO Nov 05 2014
caption on documents filed shall be 2:14-CV-2407 KJM EFB. (Marciel, M)RELATED CASE 90 ORDER signed by Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/4/2014. Action denominated 2:14-CV-2407 TLN CKD is REASSIGNED to District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan for all further proceedings. Henceforth, the


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.