California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter Carroll
Case #: 9:11-bk-12650
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Jul 21, 2011
Discharged:Feb 18, 2015
Terminated:Feb 18, 2015
Plan Confirmed:Nov 08, 2012
Discharge Objection Deadline:Sep 19, 2011

Debtor
B and H Flowers, Inc.
3615 Foothill Rd
Carpinteria, CA 93013-3053
Represented By
Carissa N Horowitz
Beall & Burkhardt, Apc
contact info
Eric W Burkhardt
Beall & Burkhardt
contact info
Natalie A Spilborghs
Beall & Burkhardt
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Creditors Committee
Represented By
Andrew A Goodman
Greenberg & Bass
contact info
Jeremy Faith
Goodman Faith LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (ND)
21051 Warner Center Lane, Suite 115
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Represented By
Brian D Fittipaldi
contact info


1. The High Cost of Saving a Failing Business (wsj.com)
Submitted Thu 03/26/2015
Docket last updated: 8 minutes ago
Friday, February 20, 2015
275 275 BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 02/20/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 270 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
274 274 BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 269. Notice Date 02/20/2015. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 271 DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR - Chapter 11 (BNC)
Wednesday, February 18, 2015
273 273 Hearing Held (Order to Show Cause Why Final Decree Should Not be Entered and Case Closed). Granted. (Rust, Kam)
Related: [-]
272 272 Bankruptcy Case Closed - DISCHARGE. Order of Discharge in the above referenced case was entered and notice was provided to parties in interest. Since it appears that no further matters are required that this case remain open, or that the jurisdiction of this Court continue, it is ordered that the Trustee is discharged, bond is exonerated, and the case is closed. Related [+] (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor B and H Flowers, Inc., Hearing (Bk Motion) Continued,34 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12,39 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor B and H Flowers, Inc.,40 Notice filed by Debtor B and H Flowers, Inc., Hearing (Bk Motion) Set,87 Application to Employ filed by Debtor B and H Flowers, Inc.,189 Notice of Hearing filed by Debtor B and H Flowers, Inc., 231 Hearing (Bk Other) Set
271 271 DISCHARGE OF DEBTOR - Chapter 11 for Debtor (BNC) (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-]
270 270 Final Decree and Order Closing Case Related [+] Signed on 2/18/2015 (Handy, Brad)
Related: [-] 1