California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah J Saltzman
Case #: 6:11-bk-29125
Case Filed:Jun 10, 2011
Dismissed:Jun 13, 2013
Terminated:Jul 08, 2013

Debtor
Joseph William Faherty
15255 Pocahantas St
Apple Valley, CA 92307-4724
Represented By
David M Reeder
contact info
T Edward Malpass
contact info
Debtor
June Elaine Faherty
15255 Pocahantas Road
Apple Valley, CA 92307
Represented By
David M Reeder
contact info
T Edward Malpass
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501
Represented By
Everett L Green
Office Of The Us Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/27/2013 8:12 PM PST
Friday, June 10, 2011
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(6:11-bk-29125) [misc,volp11] (1039.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20874968. Fee amount 1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition. Fee Amount $1039 Filed by Joseph William Faherty, June Elaine Faherty (Malpass, T) WARNING: Item subsequently amended by docket entry #2 and #3. Deficient: Exhibit D, Notice Avail Chapters, Statement of Related Case, Summary of Schedules, Schedules A to J, Declaration re Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Attorney Disclosure Statement, Debtor's Certiciation of Employment Income, Statement - Form 22B, Statement of Social Security Number(s) Form B21 and Electronic Filing Declaration. Modified on 6/13/2011 (Clodfelter, Ellen). Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2011 (Bolden, Lorraine).
Related: [-]