Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-10482

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin Gross
Case #: 1:15-bk-10481
Case Filed:Mar 05, 2015
Converted:Jul 31, 2015
Terminated:Sep 16, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Sport-Haley Holdings, Inc.
200 Union Blvd Ste 200
Lakewood, CO 80228-1831
Represented By
Agatha Christina Mingos
contact info
James S. Yoder
White And Williams LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899

Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 3:29 PM EDT
Thursday, March 05, 2015
court Case Assigned Thu 03/05 6:07 PM
Judge Kevin Gross added to case. (Drechsler, Stacey)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 03/05 4:00 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Sport-Haley Holdings, Inc.. (Yoder, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd none Thu 03/05 4:02 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-10481 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 7478450, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Joint Administration - Motion Thu 03/05 5:06 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Cases and Granting Related Relief Filed by Sport-Haley Holdings, Inc.. (Mingos, Agatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 03/05 6:29 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Nicole M. Brown . Receipt Number 0311-16857, Filed by Sport-Haley Holdings, Inc.. (Mingos, Agatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification by Counsel
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 03/05 6:32 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Sharon L. Levine . Receipt Number 0311-16857, Filed by Sport-Haley Holdings, Inc.. (Mingos, Agatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification by Counsel
Att: 2 Proposed Order
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Thu 03/05 6:34 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Wojciech F. Jung . Receipt Number 0311-16857, Filed by Sport-Haley Holdings, Inc.. (Mingos, Agatha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification by Counsel
Att: 2 Proposed Order