Navigators Insurance Company et al v. Justice
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Janet Bond Arterton |
Case #: | 3:15-cv-00329 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 05, 2015 |
Terminated: | Mar 11, 2016 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 01, 2015 9:40 AM EDT |
Defendant
Department of Justice
|
|
Defendant
Dept of Justice
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Navigators Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Navigators Management (UK) LTD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Navigators Ins. Co.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
42 | 42
appeal
USCA Mandate
Wed 06/07 10:27 AM
MANDATE of USCA dated 6/5/2017 Withdrawing39 Notice of Appeal filed by Navigators Management (UK) LTD, Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co. (Villano, P.) |
|
Thursday, September 15, 2016 | ||
41 | 41
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 09/20 2:01 PM
ORDER of USCA as to39 Notice of Appeal filed by Navigators Management (UK) LTD, Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co. USCA Case Number 16-1058 The parties in the above-referenced case have filed a stipulation withdrawing this appeal pursuant to Local Rule 42.1. The Stipulation is "So Ordered". (Villano, P.) |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2016 | ||
40 | 40
appeal
Index to Record on Appeal
Wed 04/20 2:11 PM
Index to Record on Appeal by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD re39 Notice of Appeal. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Zaino, Laura) |
|
Thursday, April 07, 2016 | ||
39 | 39
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Thu 04/07 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0205-3957397. (Zaino, Laura) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2016 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/11 11:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Pascale Zaino on behalf of Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD (Zaino, Laura) |
|
37 | 37
order
Judgment
Fri 03/11 9:26 AM
JUDGMENT. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 3/11/2016.(Villano, P.) |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Fri 03/11 9:27 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Villano, P.) |
||
Monday, February 29, 2016 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order
Mon 02/29 7:47 PM
ORDER: Because Defendant has demonstrated that the searches it conducted were adequate, summary judgment is granted in Defendant's favor on Count Two. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/29/16. (Harris, J) |
|
Thursday, February 18, 2016 | ||
35 | 35
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Thu 02/18 1:20 PM
RESPONSE TO34 CJA 30 - Appointment,,, Order,,. |
|
Thursday, January 28, 2016 | ||
34 | 34
order
CJA 30 - Appointment Order
Thu 01/28 1:01 PM
ORDER: In light of Defendant's filing of its supplemental declaration, the Court directs Plaintiffs to show cause in written briefing filed by February 18, 2016 why the Court should not grant Defendant summary judgment sua sponte on Count Two, which would conclude this case. If no briefing is filed, the Court will consider only Defendant's supplemental declaration and its sufficiency to entitle Defendant to summary judgment on Count Two. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/28/16. (Harris, J) |
|
Wednesday, January 27, 2016 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Affidavit
Wed 01/27 12:32 PM
Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re32 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,, Signed By John B. Hughes filed by Dept of Justice.(Avery, Vanessa) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-L | ||
Tuesday, January 05, 2016 | ||
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion to Strike
Tue 01/05 2:58 PM
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion22 for Summary Judgment is DENIED, their Motion28 to Strike is denied as MOOT as to Defendant's Local 56(a)2 Statement, paragraphs 25-30, 34, the first sentence of paragraph 31, and the first sentence of paragraph 35 of Ms. Francis's declaration, and DENIED as to the second sentence of paragraphs 31 and 35, as well as paragraphs 32 and 33 of Ms. Francis's declaration. The Court grants, sua sponte, summary judgment in Defendant's favor on Count One. As to Count Two, Defendant is directed to either conduct a new search or to submit a supplemental declaration demonstrating that its original searches were reasonably calculated to uncover all relevant documents. The supplemental declaration shall be filed within thirty days of this Ruling. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 1/5/16. (Harris, J) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 12/23 8:59 AM
REPLY to Response to28 MOTION to Strike25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Affidavit) filed by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD. |
|
Monday, December 14, 2015 | ||
30 | 30
8
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Mon 12/14 9:45 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re28 MOTION to Strike25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Affidavit) filed by Dept of Justice. (Avery, Vanessa) |
|
Monday, November 23, 2015 | ||
29 | 29
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Mon 11/23 3:20 PM
Memorandum in Support re28 MOTION to Strike25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Affidavit) filed by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD. |
|
28 | 28
motion
Strike
Mon 11/23 3:16 PM
MOTION to Strike25 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion (Affidavit) by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD.Responses due by 12/14/2015 |
|
27 | 27
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 11/23 3:06 PM
REPLY to Response to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD. |
|
Friday, November 06, 2015 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 11/06 9:46 AM
REPLY to Response to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD. |
|
Friday, October 23, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 10/23 10:11 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Dept of Justice.(Avery, Vanessa) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Material Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of T. Francis, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-I, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit J | ||
Thursday, October 01, 2015 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Statement of Material Facts
Thu 10/01 3:09 PM
Statement of Material Facts re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B1, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B3, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit B4, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit B5, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit B6, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit B7, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit B8 | ||
23 | 23
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Thu 10/01 3:02 PM
Memorandum in Support re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD. |
|
22 | 22
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 10/01 2:59 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD.Responses due by 10/22/2015 |
|
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 10/01 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meg R. Reid on behalf of Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD |
|
Monday, September 21, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Settlement Conference
Mon 09/21 12:02 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joan G. Margolis: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 9/21/2015. 7 minutes. No settlement. (Watson, M.) |
|
Thursday, September 17, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 09/17 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meg R. Reid on behalf of Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co., Navigators Management (UK) LTD |
|
Tuesday, September 15, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
utility
Calendar Entry
Tue 09/15 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 9/21/2015 The Settlement Conference that was set for 9/21/2015 at 10:00am in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis, will now be held telephonically on 9/21/2015 at 11:30am before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call to Chambers with counsel on the line: (203) 773-2350. (Watson, M.) |
|
Thursday, August 13, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
utility
Calendar Entry
Thu 08/13 1:52 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference is set for 9/21/2015 at 10:00 AM in Chambers Room 303, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Joan G. Margolis. Parties/Party representatives must be available by telephone if unable to attend the conference. (Watson, M.) |
|
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/13 7:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The DOJ's Vaughn Index will be served on plaintiff by 8/28/15. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment will be filed by 10/1/2015; opposition will be filed by 10/23/2015; any reply will be filed by 11/6/2015.The parties are referred to Magisrate Judge Margolis for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference in September 2015. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2015 Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/12/2015.(Villano, P.) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/13 7:52 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Joan G. Margolis for Settlement Conference Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 8/12/2015.(Villano, P.) |
|
Wednesday, August 12, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 08/13 2:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Janet Bond Arterton: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/12/2015. Total Time: 0 hours and 45 minutes(Court Reporter Julia Cashman.) (Villano, P.) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/04 11:18 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Dept of Justice. (Avery, Vanessa) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2015 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/28 3:49 PM
A telephonic status conference will be held on 8/12/15 at 10:00 a.m. Defense counsel shall initiate the conference call to chambers: 203-773-2737. Status Reports shall be filed by 8/5/15. (Tooker, A.) |
||
Friday, May 08, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/08 2:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Dept of Justice.(Avery, Vanessa) |
|
Tuesday, April 14, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 04/14 3:52 PM
Supplemental SUMMONS Returned Executed by Navigators Ins. Co., Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Management (UK) LTD. (Gostyla, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, April 09, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Thu 04/09 9:28 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to 5/8/15. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 4/7/15. (Tooker, A.) |
|
utility
Update Answer Deadline
Thu 04/09 9:28 AM
Answer deadline updated for All Defendants. (Tooker, A.) |
||
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/08 3:32 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2015 to Answer or Respond to1 Complaint, by Dept of Justice. (Avery, Vanessa) |
|
Monday, March 23, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed - FOIA
Mon 03/23 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Navigators Ins. Co., Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Management (UK) LTD. Dept of Justice served on 3/9/2015, answer due 4/8/2015. (Gostyla, Jeffrey) |
|
Tuesday, March 17, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/17 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vanessa Roberts Avery on behalf of Dept of Justice (Avery, Vanessa) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order of Transfer
Tue 03/10 3:03 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Janet Bond Arterton for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 3/9/15.(Johnson, D.) |
|
Friday, March 06, 2015 | ||
5 | 5
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 03/06 12:01 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Dept of Justice* with answer to complaint due within *30* days. Attorney *Jeffrey F. Gostyla* *Halloran & Sage* *One Goodwin Sq., 225 Asylum St.* *Hartford, CT 06103*. (Sundie, T) |
|
4 | 4
order
Electronic Service Documents
Fri 03/06 11:53 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Complaint, filed by Navigators Management (UK) LTD, Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Ins. Co.,2 Electronic Filing Order,3 Protective Order. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/15. (Sundie, T) |
|
Thursday, March 05, 2015 | ||
3 | 3
order
Protective Order
Fri 03/06 11:51 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/5/15. (Sundie, T) |
|
2 | 2
order
Electronic Filing Order
Fri 03/06 11:49 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 3/5/15.(Sundie, T) |
|
Att: 1 E-File Attachment | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 03/05 11:55 AM
COMPLAINT against Department of Justice ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-3529715.), filed by Navigators Insurance Company, Certain Interested of Underwriters at Lloyd's of London, Navigators Management (UK) LTD.(Gostyla, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-G, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet | ||
service
Request to Issue Summons
Thu 03/05 11:57 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Department of Justice. (Gostyla, Jeffrey) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 03/06 10:07 AM
Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.) |