Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David R Jones
Case #: 6:15-bk-60016
Case Filed:Mar 09, 2015
Creditor Meeting:May 12, 2015
Claims Deadline:Aug 10, 2015
Terminated:Jan 03, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Nov 12, 2015

Debtor
BPZ Resources, Inc.
Two Westlake Bldg. 580 Westlake Park Blvd., Ste. 525
Houston, TX 77079
Represented By
Walter J Cicack
Hawash Meade Gaston Neese & Cicack LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Marty L Brimmage
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Charles R Gibbs
Akin Gump Et Al
contact info
Trustee
Gilbert Nathan, Liquidating Trustee of the BPZ Liduidating Trust
BPZ Liquidating Trust 15 Sandhopper Trail
Westport, CT 06880
Represented By
William James Hotze
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info
Charles M. Rubio
Diamond Mccarthy, LLP
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Hector Duran
U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Bankrupt BPZ Energy looks for buyer (petroglobalnews.com)
Submitted Thu 06/11/2015
2. BPZ Resources Files for Bankruptcy Protection Amid Oil-Price Drop (wsj.com)
Submitted Tue 03/10/2015
Docket last updated: 10 minutes ago
Friday, January 05, 2018
468 468 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/05 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 01/05/2018. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 467 Final Decree
Wednesday, January 03, 2018
467 467 order Final Decree (No Form) Wed 01/03 11:36 AM
Final Decree and Order Closing Chapter 11 Case Related [+] Signed on 1/3/2018 (LinhthuDo)
Related: [-] 463 Motion for Final Decree