Todd D. Wakefield
Utah Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Joel T Marker |
Case #: | 2:15-bk-21946 |
Case Filed: | Mar 09, 2015 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 08, 2015 |
Discharged: | Jun 10, 2015 |
Terminated: | Jun 18, 2015 |
Discharge Objection Deadline: | Jun 08, 2015 |
Debtor
Todd D. Wakefield
871 Abigail Dr.
Heber City, UT 84032 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Philip G. Jones tr
1215 South Main Street
Orem, UT 84058 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Ken Garff Bldg. 405 South Main Street Suite 300
Salt Lake City, UT 84111 |
Docket last updated: 11/07/2017 3:45 PM MST |
Monday, March 09, 2015 | ||
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) 15-21946 [misc,volp7a] ( 335.00). Receipt number 15907649, amount 335.00. (U.S. Treasury) (EOD: 03/09/2015) | ||
Creditor(s) uploaded (15 creditors). (Rife, Knute) (EOD: 03/09/2015) | ||
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Philip G. Jones tr, with 341(a) meeting to be held on 04/08/2015 at Provo City Library Objections for Discharge due by 06/08/2015. (EOD: 03/09/2015) | ||
1 | 1 6 pgs Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition. Filed by Todd D. Wakefield (Rife, Knute) (EOD: 03/09/2015) | |
2 | 2 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (per BR 2016) filed by Debtor(s). (Rife, Knute) (EOD: 03/09/2015) | |
3 | 3 Statement of Social Security Number(s) filed by Debtor(s). (Rife, Knute) (EOD: 03/09/2015) | |
4 | 4 Chapter 7 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income Form 22A-1 filed by Debtor(s). (Rife, Knute) (EOD: 03/09/2015) |