Member Case
Lead case is: 1:11-bk-11941

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Kevin J Carey
Case #: 1:11-bk-11970
Case Filed:Jun 26, 2011
Converted:Mar 31, 2012
Terminated:Feb 27, 2014

Debtor
Deb Shops, Inc.
9401 Blue Grass Rd
Philadelphia, PA 19114-2305
Represented By
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Michael F. Walsh
Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
George L. Miller
1628 John F. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
TERMINATED PARTIES
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC (KCC)
Terminated: 03/30/2012
2335 Alaska Ave.
El Segundo, CA 90245

Docket last updated: 02/27/2013 2:28 AM EST
Sunday, June 26, 2011
1 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1039. Filed by Deb Shops, Inc.. (Collins, Mark)
Related: [-]
2 2 Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 11-11970 [misc,volp11a] (1039.00). Receipt Number 5334116, amount $1039.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
3 3 Motion for Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases Filed By Deb Shops, Inc. (Madron, Jason)
Related: [-]