Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter J Walsh
Case #: 1:11-bk-12005
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2011
Creditor Meeting:Aug 09, 2011
Terminated:Sep 23, 2014
Plan Confirmed:May 31, 2012

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors5,001-10,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other

Debtor
Nebraska Book Company, Inc.
4700 S 19th St
Lincoln, NE 68512-1216
Represented By
Daniel R. Hodgman
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
contact info
Laura Davis Jones
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Chad J. Husnick
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
contact info
Peter J. Keane
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter Nemer, P.C.
contact info
Mark E. McKane, Esq.
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
James E. O'Neill
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Marc Kieselstein
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
Claims Agent
Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC
www.kccllc.com 2335 Alaska Ave
El Segundo, CA 90245
Represented By
Albert Kass
Kurtzman Carson Consultants, LLC
contact info
Creditor Committee
OFFICIAL COMMITTEE OF UNSECURED CREDITORS
Represented By
Maria Aprile Sawczuk
Stevens & Lee, P.C.
contact info
Joseph H. Huston, Jr.
Stevens & Lee
contact info
Bruce S. Nathan
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Bruce Buechler
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Wojciech F. Jung
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
John K. Sherwood
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Michael Savetsky
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Successor Trustee
The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., as Successor Trustee
Represented By
James Gadsden
Carter Ledyard & Milburn LLP
contact info
Trustee
Wilmington Trust, National Association (successor in interest to Wilmington Trust FSB)
Represented By
Leib M Lerner
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
J. William Boone
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Duane David Werb
Werb & Sullivan
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
844 King Street, Room 2207 Lockbox #35
Wilmington, DE 19899
Represented By
Tiiara N. A. Patton
Dep'T Of Justice -Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 31, 2014
1718 1718 The transcriber has requested a standing order for all hearings in this case for the period 12/31/2014 to 1/14/2015. To obtain a copy of a transcript contact the transcriber Veritext. Telephone number 516-608-2400. (AJL)
Related: [-]