Member Case
Lead case is: 1:15-bk-10578

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Michael E Wiles
Case #: 1:15-bk-10580
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2015
Terminated:Sep 21, 2016

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$500,000,001 to $1 billion
Est. Liabilities $500,000,001 to $1 billion
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Chassix, Inc.
300 Galleria Office Center, Suite 501
Southfield, MI 48034
Represented By
Ray C Schrock
Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


1. Pistons Owner Tom Gores' Auto Supply Firm Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (deadlinedetroit.com)
Submitted Thu 03/12/2015
Docket last updated: 6 minutes ago
Wednesday, September 21, 2016
misc Close Bankruptcy Case Wed 09/21 11:36 AM
Case Closed. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 20, 2016
misc Terminate Party Tue 09/20 11:22 AM
Prime Clerk LLC. Claims Agent is terminated from case. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 13, 2016
13 13 order Order (for Multi-Cases) - Court use only Fri 05/13 3:03 PM
Final Decree signed on 5/13/20/16 closing chapter 11 cases. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Order of Final Decree (BNC) Fri 05/13 2:59 PM
Final Decree signed on 5/13/20/16 closing chapter 11 cases. (=DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2016
11 11 motion Application, Final Decree Wed 05/04 6:52 PM
Application for Final Decree : Notice of Presentment of Motion of Reorganized Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 350(a) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3022 for Entry of a Final Decree Closing Chapter 11 Cases filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Chassix, Inc. Responses due by 5/10/2016, with presentment to be held on 5/12/2016 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 617 (MEW). (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 24, 2016
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Wed 02/24 11:13 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 09, 2015
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Tue 06/09 11:38 AM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2015
10 10 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 06/03 4:09 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Chassix, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Schedules Wed 06/03 4:08 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Chassix, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 24, 2015
8 8 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 03/24 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Martin A. Mooney on behalf of Ford Motor Credit Company LLC as agent for CAB West, LLC.(Mooney, Martin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, March 12, 2015
7 7 order Motion, Joint Administration Thu 03/12 1:28 PM
Order signed on 3/12/2015 directing joint administration of chapter 11 cases 15-10577 15-10578 15-10579 15-10580 15-10581 15-10582 15-10583 15-10584 15-10585 15-10586 15-10587 15-10588 15-10589 15-10590 15-10591 15-10592 15-10593 and 15-10594 under case 15-10578 (Chassix Holdings, Inc., et al.) Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 3
6 6 order Motion. Authorize Thu 03/12 1:03 PM
Emergency Bridge Order signed on 3/12/2015 authorizing Debtors to pay certain prepetition wages and use cash collateral to fund payroll Related [+]. (DePierola, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 5
5 5 motion Motion, Authorize Thu 03/12 12:43 PM
Motion to Authorize : Emergency Motion of Debtors Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 363(b), 363(c), and 105(a), for Entry of a Bridge Order Authorizing the Debtors to (I) Pay Certain Prepetition Wages and (II) Use Cash Collateral to Fund Payroll filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Chassix, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
4 4 154 pgs ans Declaration Thu 03/12 12:16 PM
Declaration of J. Mark Allan Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 1007-2 Related [+] filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Chassix, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 motion Motion, Joint Administration Thu 03/12 11:52 AM
Motion for Joint Administration : Motion of Debtors for Entry of Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1015(b) Directing Joint Administration of Chapter 11 Cases filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Chassix, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 03/12 11:31 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 1007(a)(1) and Local Rule 1007-3 . Related [+] Filed by Ray C Schrock on behalf of Chassix, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 18 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 03/12 10:24 AM
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A due 03/26/2015. Schedule B due 03/26/2015. Schedule C due 03/26/2015. Schedule D due 03/26/2015. Schedule E due 03/26/2015. Schedule F due 03/26/2015. Schedule G due 03/26/2015. Schedule H due 03/26/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 1 due 03/26/2015. Summary of schedules - Page 2 (Statistical Summary) due 03/26/2015. Statement of Financial Affairs due 03/26/2015. Incomplete Filings due by 03/26/2015, Chapter 11 Plan due by 7/10/2015, Disclosure Statement due by 7/10/2015, Initial Case Conference due by 4/13/2015, Filed by Ray C Schrock of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP on behalf of Chassix, Inc.. (Schrock, Ray)
Related: [-]
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie).
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 03/12 11:11 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 15-10580 [misc,824] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 10591071. Fee amount 1717.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Thu 03/12 10:26 AM
Judge Michael E. Wiles added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Thu 03/12 3:54 PM
Case Joint Administration. All entries shall be made in the lead case 15-10578 (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]